EP2857840 - Method for predicting implantation success in assisted fertilisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Femalon S.P.R.L. Rue de Travail 16 4460 Grâce-Hollogne / BE | [2017/27] |
Former [2015/15] | For all designated states Femalon S.P.R.L. Rue Saint Exupéry 17 4460 Bierset / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lédée, Nathalie MatriceLab Innove Activité Recherche Innovation UMRS-976 université Paris Diderot Hopital Saint Louis - Pavillon Bazin (porte 2), 1, avenue Claude Vellefaux 75010 Paris / FR | 02 /
Piccinni, Marie-Pierre c/o University of Florence Department of Experimental and Clinical Medicine Largo Brambilla 3 50134 Florence / IT | 03 /
Lombroso, Raoul c/o Université Versailles St-Quentin en Yvelines Unité clinique d'AMP CHI Poissy St-Germain en Laye 10 rue du Champs Gaillard 78300 Poissy / FR | [2015/45] |
Former [2015/15] | 01 /
Lédée, Nathalie MatriceLab Innove Activité Recherche Innovation UMRS-976 université Paris Diderot Hopital Saint Louis - Pavillon Bazin (porte 2), 1, avenue Claude Vellefaux 75010 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Piccinni, Marie-Pierre c/o University of Florence Department of Internal Medicine Immunoallergology Unit Viale Morgagni 85 50134 Florence / IT | |||
03 /
Lombroso, Raoul c/o Université Versailles St-Quentin en Yvelines Unité clinique d'AMP CHI Poissy St-Germain en Laye 10 rue du Champs Gaillard 78300 Poissy / FR | Representative(s) | Gyi, Jeffrey Ivan, et al De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10 a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2015/15] | Application number, filing date | 15150111.1 | 18.07.2007 | [2015/15] | Priority number, date | US20060832094P | 21.07.2006 Original published format: US 832094 P | [2015/15] | Previously filed application, date | EP20100162987 | 18.07.2007 | [2015/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2857840 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2857840 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2857840 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2015/15] | CPC: |
G01N33/689 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/53 (KR);
A61P15/08 (EP);
G01N33/53 (KR);
G01N33/68 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vorhersage des Implantationserfolgs bei der assistierten Befruchtung | [2015/15] | English: | Method for predicting implantation success in assisted fertilisation | [2015/15] | French: | Procédé pour prédire le succès d'implantation dans la fécondation assistée | [2015/15] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 07.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.12.2016 | 08.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 03.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07787688.6 / EP2049906 | EP10162987.1 / EP2214021 | Divisional application(s) | EP17175527.5 / EP3267198 | EP19194901.5 / EP3627156 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2007 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | IE | 18.07.2017 | LU | 18.07.2017 | MT | 18.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.07.2007 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 18.07.2007 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.07.2007 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
MT | 18.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
LU | 18.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 |