EP2902593 - Fan containment system in an axial gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drozdz, Mickael c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Moor Lane (ML-9) PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15150592.2 | 09.01.2015 | [2015/32] | Priority number, date | GB20140001767 | 03.02.2014 Original published format: GB 201401767 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2902593 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2902593 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D21/04, F04D29/52 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
F01D21/045 (EP,US);
F04D29/526 (EP,US);
F05D2220/36 (US);
F05D2240/14 (US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] |
Former [2015/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Fan-Rückhaltesystem in einem axialen Gasturbinentriebwerk | [2015/32] | English: | Fan containment system in an axial gas turbine engine | [2015/32] | French: | Système de confinement de soufflante dans un moteur à turbine à gaz axial | [2015/32] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 29.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.01.2015 | AL | 26.09.2018 | AT | 26.09.2018 | CY | 26.09.2018 | CZ | 26.09.2018 | DK | 26.09.2018 | EE | 26.09.2018 | ES | 26.09.2018 | FI | 26.09.2018 | HR | 26.09.2018 | IT | 26.09.2018 | LT | 26.09.2018 | LV | 26.09.2018 | MC | 26.09.2018 | MK | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | PL | 26.09.2018 | RO | 26.09.2018 | RS | 26.09.2018 | SE | 26.09.2018 | SI | 26.09.2018 | SK | 26.09.2018 | SM | 26.09.2018 | TR | 26.09.2018 | BG | 26.12.2018 | NO | 26.12.2018 | GR | 27.12.2018 | IE | 09.01.2019 | LU | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | IS | 26.01.2019 | PT | 26.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 09.01.2015 | |
AL | 26.09.2018 | ||
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CY | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
TR | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IE | 09.01.2019 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SI | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
LU | 09.01.2019 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
MC | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
DK | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
SM | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
PT | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
AT | 26.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
EE | 26.09.2018 | ||
ES | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
SK | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
CZ | 26.09.2018 | ||
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
PL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RO | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
IT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
IS | 26.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 26.09.2018 | |
FI | 26.09.2018 | ||
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
LV | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
HR | 26.09.2018 | ||
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
RS | 26.09.2018 | ||
SE | 26.09.2018 | ||
BG | 26.12.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
GR | 27.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 26.09.2018 | |
LT | 26.09.2018 | ||
NO | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0816640 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [Y] 1,7,9,10,15* figures 3,4 *; | [X]GB2407343 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,3,5-9,11-15 * pages 1,2,8-11; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US2011076132 (BOTTOME KRISTOFER JOHN [GB]) [Y] 1,2,4,10-15 * figures 2-7 *; | [Y]EP2495400 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [Y] 1,2,4,7-10,15 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034]; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US2013136577 (EVANS DALE EDWARD [GB]) [Y] 1,4,7,8,11-15 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP2620654 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0049]; figures 2-14 *; | [XP]EP2767676 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [XP] 1,2,4-15 * paragraphs [0061] , [0070] - [0072] - [0093] - [0096]; figures 3-10 * |