EP2921267 - Robot system, calibration method in robot system, and position correcting method in robot system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzumura, Kazuki c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Toshimichi c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | 03 /
Nakamura, Koji c/o KABUSHIKI KAISHA YASKAWA DENKI 2-1, Kurosaki-Shiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15150748.0 | 12.01.2015 | [2015/39] | Priority number, date | JP20140053072 | 17.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014053072 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2921267 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2921267 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
B25J9/16 (CN);
B25J9/1674 (CN);
B25J9/1692 (EP,US);
B25J9/1697 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39024 (US);
G05B2219/40607 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Robotersystem, Kalibrierungsverfahren in einem Robotersystem und Positionskorrekturverfahren in einem Robotersystem | [2015/39] | English: | Robot system, calibration method in robot system, and position correcting method in robot system | [2015/39] | French: | Système de robot, procédé d'étalonnage dans un système de robot et procédé de correction de position dans un système de robot | [2015/39] | Examination procedure | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 06.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6304050 (SKAAR STEVEN B [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 6, line 49 - column 14, line 9; figures 1-13 *; | [A]DE102009014766 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0077]; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | JP2010172986 |