EP2897069 - Managing physiological exercise data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polar Electro Oy Professorintie 5 90440 Kempele / FI | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erkkilä, Mika Polar Electro Oy Professorintie 5 90440 Kempele / FI | 02 /
Rae, Riikka Polar Electro Oy Professorintie 5 90440 Kempele / FI | 03 /
Thurlin, Tomi Polar Electro Oy Professorintie 5 90440 Kempele / FI | 04 /
Korva, Tuomo Polar Electro Oy Professorintie 5 90440 KEMPELE / FI | 05 /
Manninen, Tony Polar Electro Oy Professorintie 5 90440 Kempele / FI | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 15150765.4 | 12.01.2015 | [2015/30] | Priority number, date | US201414157163 | 16.01.2014 Original published format: US201414157163 | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2897069 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
G16H40/67 (EP,US);
A63B24/0062 (US);
A63B71/0619 (US);
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
A63B2024/0065 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] |
Former [2015/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwaltung der Daten von physiologischer Übung | [2015/30] | English: | Managing physiological exercise data | [2015/30] | French: | Gestion de données d'exercice physiologique | [2015/30] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 20.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/20] | 03.01.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP2610808 (ADIDAS AG [DE]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0067] * * claims 1-35 * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]GB2495014 (POLAR ELECTRO OY [FI]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * page 2 - page 17 * * claims 1-25 *; | [A]US2005070809 (ACRES JOHN F [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0108] * * claims 1-31 * * figures 1, 3, 8, 13 *; | [A]US2006200009 (WEKELL WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0117] * * claims 1-20 * |