EP2924624 - Method of diagnosing operating characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IZUMI, Yoshifumi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
KIYAMA, Noboru c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
SOBUE, Tsuneo c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Toshimitsu c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | Application number, filing date | 15151041.9 | 14.01.2015 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | JP20140061446 | 25.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014061446 | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2924624 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q10/00, G06Q40/08 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0639 (EP,US);
G07C5/0808 (US);
G06F16/285 (EP,US);
G06Q10/20 (EP,US);
G06Q40/08 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (US);
G06G7/76 (US);
G06Q40/00 (EP,US);
G06Q40/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Diagnose von Betriebsmerkmalen | [2015/40] | English: | Method of diagnosing operating characteristics | [2015/40] | French: | Procédé de diagnostic de caractéristiques de fonctionnement | [2015/40] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 03.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/17] | 07.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1403826 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [I]WO2006130146 (INNOSURANCE INC [US]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, line 8 - page 5, line 2 * * page 7, line 18 - page 27, line 2 *; | [I]WO2014028377 (INSURANCE SERVICES OFFICE INC [US]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, line 6 - page 3, line 11 * * page 5, line 2 - page 18, line 29 *; | [I]WO2014031723 (INSURANCE SERVICES OFFICE INC [US]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, line 7 - page 2, line 13 * * page 4, line 2 - page 18, line 20 * | by applicant | JP4995046B |