EP2898840 - Variable compression surgical fastener cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marczyk, Stanislaw 113A River Bend Road Stratford, CT Connecticut 06614 / US | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Morgan, Marc Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/31] | Morgan, Marc Maschio & Soames IP Limited 20 Carlton Crescent Southampton, SO15 2ET / GB | Application number, filing date | 15151525.1 | 07.05.2009 | [2015/31] | Priority number, date | US20080051890P | 09.05.2008 Original published format: US 51890 P | US20090410850 | 25.03.2009 Original published format: US 410850 | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2898840 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2898840 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, A61B17/064 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B17/0644 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07242 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | A61B17/072 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2015/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kartusche mit variabler Kompression für chirurgische Klammern | [2015/31] | English: | Variable compression surgical fastener cartridge | [2015/31] | French: | Cartouche de fixation chirurgicale à compression variable | [2015/31] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 29.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09251269.8 / EP2116196 | Divisional application(s) | EP16186617.3 / EP3135224 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2009 | AT | 05.10.2016 | BE | 05.10.2016 | CY | 05.10.2016 | CZ | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | HR | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | MK | 05.10.2016 | NL | 05.10.2016 | PL | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | NO | 05.01.2017 | GR | 06.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | LU | 07.05.2017 | MT | 07.05.2017 | CH | 31.05.2017 | LI | 31.05.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 07.05.2009 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 07.05.2009 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 07.05.2009 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
MT | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 07.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 31.05.2017 | ||
LI | 31.05.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5865361 (MILLIMAN KEITH L [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * column 11, line 23 - column 12, line 67; figures 21-34 *; | [A]US2007131732 (HOLSTEN HENRY E [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0107] - paragraph [0109]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0116]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0128]; figures 8-10 * * paragraph [0184] - paragraph [0196]; figures 24-26,31 *; | [A]US2007244351 (WAZER DAVID E [US], et al) [A] 3 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] ** figure 8 *; | [YA]US2007262116 (HUEIL JOSEPH C [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-7 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0078]; figures 3,4 * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0107]; figures 18-20,23 * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0116]; figures 28,32 * * paragraph [0122]; figures 42,43 * * paragraph [0150]; figure 76 * [A] 3,8-14; | [Y]US2008078803 (SHELTON FREDERICK E [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,4-7 * paragraph [0342] * * paragraph [0362] * * figures 96-100 * | by applicant | US5318221 | US5782396 | US5797538 | US5817109 | US5836503 | US5862972 | US5865361 | US5878937 | US5894979 | US5915616 | US5964394 | US6045560 | US6202914 | US7070083 | US7258262 | US20030444761 | US20050253493 | US20060444664 | US20080044682 | US20080044664 |