EP2899551 - Current detection structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI METALS, LTD. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8614 / JP | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okuyama, Ken c/o Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8614 / JP | 02 /
Chiwata, Naofumi c/o Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8614 / JP | 03 /
Akimoto, Katsuya c/o Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8614 / JP | 04 /
Futakuchi, Naoki c/o Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8614 / JP | 05 /
Ikeda, Yukio c/o Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8614 / JP | 06 /
Takahashi, Kazuhisa c/o Hitachi Metals, Ltd. 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8614 / JP | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theatinerstraße 8 (Fünf Höfe) 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15151708.3 | 20.01.2015 | [2015/31] | Priority number, date | JP20140008775 | 21.01.2014 Original published format: JP 2014008775 | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2899551 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2899551 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/20 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
G01R15/207 (EP,US);
G01R19/0092 (US);
G01R33/093 (US);
G01R15/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2015/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stromerfassungsstruktur | [2015/31] | English: | Current detection structure | [2015/31] | French: | Structure de détection de courant | [2015/31] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 17.11.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE29804737U (SSG HALBLEITER VERTRIEBS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * page 8 - page 10; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US6040690 (LADDS DAVID ANTHONY [GB]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 21; figures 7-11 *; | [X]DE10051160 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]DE10054016 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-4; claims 1,6 * [I] 4,5; | [X]DE102004050019 (SSG SEMICONDUCTOR SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0028] *; | [X]JP2006184269 (YAZAKI CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008030129 (POPOVIC RADIVOJE [RS]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]US2009021249 (KUMAR SACHIN [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0041]; figure 8; claim 1 *; | [X]US2010026286 (KOSS SEBASTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034]; figures 11-16 *; | [X]WO2013038867 (ALPS GREEN DEVICES CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JP5153481B | JP2013170878 |