EP3047781 - Autonomously operable floor vacuum cleaner, method for vacuum-cleaning and use of an autonomously operable floor vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eurofilters N.V. Lieven Gevaertlaan 21, Nolimpark 1013 3900 Overpelt / BE | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schultink, Jan c/o EUROFILTERS N.V. Lieven Gevaertlaan 21 Nolimpark 1013 3900 Overpelt / BE | 02 /
Sauer, Ralf c/o EUROFILTERS N.V. Lieven Gevaertlaan 21 Nolimpark 1013 3900 Overpelt / BE | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2016/30] | Application number, filing date | 15151818.0 | 20.01.2015 | [2016/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3047781 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3047781 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/16 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
A47L5/225 (EP,CN,US);
A47L9/2852 (US);
A47L5/362 (EP,CN,US);
A47L9/0411 (US);
A47L9/0477 (US);
A47L9/0606 (US);
A47L9/1666 (US);
A47L9/1683 (US);
A47L9/22 (US);
A47L9/246 (EP,CN,US);
A47L9/26 (RU);
A47L9/2805 (US);
A47L9/2884 (US);
A47L9/2894 (US);
A47L2201/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/49] |
Former [2016/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Autonom betreibbarer Bodenstaubsauger, Verfahren zum Staubsaugen sowie Verwendung eines autonom betreibbaren Bodenstaubsaugers | [2016/30] | English: | Autonomously operable floor vacuum cleaner, method for vacuum-cleaning and use of an autonomously operable floor vacuum cleaner | [2016/30] | French: | Aspirateur-traîneau à activation autonome, procédé d'aspiration de poussières et utilisation d'un aspirateur-traîneau utilisable à activation autonome | [2016/30] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2015 | Examination requested [2016/30] | 12.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2015 | AL | 28.08.2019 | CY | 28.08.2019 | CZ | 28.08.2019 | DK | 28.08.2019 | EE | 28.08.2019 | FI | 28.08.2019 | HR | 28.08.2019 | LT | 28.08.2019 | LV | 28.08.2019 | MC | 28.08.2019 | MK | 28.08.2019 | MT | 28.08.2019 | PL | 28.08.2019 | RO | 28.08.2019 | RS | 28.08.2019 | SI | 28.08.2019 | SK | 28.08.2019 | SM | 28.08.2019 | BG | 28.11.2019 | GR | 29.11.2019 | IS | 28.12.2019 | PT | 30.12.2019 | IE | 20.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 20.01.2015 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
MT | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IE | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 28.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1360922 (ROYAL APPLIANCE MFG [US]) [X] 1,3-6,8-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033] * * paragraph [0061] * [Y] 2-5,7,8,13,14,16 [I] 2; | [IY]WO2007117095 (LEE BA-DO [KR]) [I] 1-6,8-10,15 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] * [Y] 2-5,7,11-14,16; | [XYI]US2010256812 (TSUSAKA YUKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,9-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0160] - [0161] * [Y] 2-5,7,8,11-13,16 [I] 2; | [Y]EP2420171 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 7,13,16* paragraph [0010] *; | [Y]DE102011083319 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 2-5 * paragraphs [0031] - [0032] * | by applicant | US3876255 | WO2007068444 | US2007272463 | EP2741483 | DE102013100192 | EP20140179375 |