EP2902552 - Wear member for excavating equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Esco Group LLC 2141 NW 25th Avenue Portland, Oregon 97210 / US | [2018/37] |
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states ESCO CORPORATION 2141 N.W. 25th Avenue Portland Oregon 97210 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carpenter, Christopher M. 19047 SW Chesapeake Drive Tualatin, OR Oregon 97062 / US | 02 /
Conklin, Donald M. 4575 SW Upper Drive Lake Oswego, OR Oregon 97035 / US | 03 /
Morris, Ray J. 8325 N Wasbash Avenue Portland, OR Oregon 97217 / US | 04 /
Bearden, James E. 13520 SW Weir Road Beaverton, OR Oregon 97008 / US | 05 /
Durand, Sevem D. 5736 N Maryland Avenue Portland, OR Oregon 97217 / US | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Madgwick, Paul Roland Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Madgwick, Paul Roland Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15151947.7 | 28.03.2007 | [2015/32] | Priority number, date | US20060787268P | 30.03.2006 Original published format: US 787268 P | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2902552 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2902552 | Date: | 17.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/28 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
E02F9/2833 (EP,US);
E02F9/28 (EP,KR,US);
B23P11/00 (KR,US);
E02F9/2808 (KR,US);
E02F9/2825 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2841 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2866 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2875 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2883 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verschleißelement für Erdbewegungmaschinen | [2015/32] | English: | Wear member for excavating equipment | [2015/32] | French: | Ensemble d'usure pour élément d'excavation | [2015/32] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 10.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07754397.3 / EP1999317 | Divisional application(s) | EP17178562.9 / EP3249119 | EP17179229.4 / EP3249120 | EP17179237.7 / EP3263776 | EP17179241.9 / EP3263777 | EP17179247.6 / EP3263778 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 17.06.2020 | MT | 17.06.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2021/45] | MC | 17.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5709043 (JONES LARREN F [US], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [XA]EP1096073 (METALOGENIA SA [ES]) [X] 1,6,8,9,13 * column 5, line 40 - line 44; figures 1,2,11,17,18 * * abstract * [A] 7; | [XAY]WO0204750 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1-5,9,13 * abstract * [A] 7 [Y] 10-12; | [Y]US2004118021 (RENSKI WILLIAMS J [US]) [Y] 10-12 * abstract *; | [ADP]US7174661 (BRISCOE TERRY L [US]) [ADP] 1* abstract * | by applicant | US5709043 | US7174661 |