EP2930812 - Reactive power management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RWE Deutschland AG Kruppstrasse 5 45128 Essen / DE | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaul, Armin, Dr.-Ing. Hirschwiese 41 59379 Selm / DE | 02 /
Hammerschmidt, Torsten, Dr. Ackerstraße 12a 44267 Dortmund / DE | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2015/42] | Application number, filing date | 15152153.1 | 22.01.2015 | [2015/42] | Priority number, date | DE20141005168 | 09.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014005168 | [2015/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2930812 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2930812 | Date: | 01.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/50, H02J3/06, H02J3/38, H02J3/16 | [2022/28] | CPC: |
H02J3/06 (EP,US);
H02J3/16 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/50 (EP,US);
H02J2300/20 (EP,US);
H02J2300/30 (EP,US);
Y02E40/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | H02J3/06, H02J3/16, H02J3/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] |
Former [2015/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Blindleistungsmanagement | [2015/42] | English: | Reactive power management | [2015/42] | French: | Gestion de puissance apparente | [2022/28] |
Former [2015/42] | Gestion de puissance apparente | Examination procedure | 12.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 20.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.03.2022 | Observations by third parties | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2020
23.12.2020
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/10] |
Former [2021/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2020
23.12.2020
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2021/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.2020
23.12.2020
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | 27.01.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.06.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.04.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.08.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.08.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 26.10.2022 | Appeal received No. T2357/22 | 26.10.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 05.01.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 01.04.2020 | CY | 01.04.2020 | CZ | 01.04.2020 | DK | 01.04.2020 | EE | 01.04.2020 | FI | 01.04.2020 | HR | 01.04.2020 | LT | 01.04.2020 | LV | 01.04.2020 | MC | 01.04.2020 | MK | 01.04.2020 | MT | 01.04.2020 | PL | 01.04.2020 | RO | 01.04.2020 | RS | 01.04.2020 | SE | 01.04.2020 | SI | 01.04.2020 | SK | 01.04.2020 | SM | 01.04.2020 | BG | 01.07.2020 | NO | 01.07.2020 | GR | 02.07.2020 | IS | 01.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
MK | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CY | 01.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
MC | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SI | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
EE | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
PL | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SK | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
DK | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RO | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
SM | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 01.04.2020 | |
CZ | 01.04.2020 | ||
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
RS | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
HR | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
LV | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
GR | 02.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 01.04.2020 | |
FI | 01.04.2020 | ||
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 01.04.2020 | |
LT | 01.04.2020 | ||
SE | 01.04.2020 | ||
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 01.04.2020 | |
BG | 01.07.2020 | ||
NO | 01.07.2020 | ||
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | BG | 01.07.2020 | |
IS | 01.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | BG | 01.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US5760492 (KANOI MINORU [JP], et al) [I] 10-12 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 30 * * column 5, line 10 - column 11, line 52 *[A] 1-9; | [XA]EP1906505 (KACO GERAETETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 10-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0020] - [0040] * [A] 1-9; | [XA]US2013161951 (BECH JOHN [DK], et al) [X] 10-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0072] * [A] 1-9; | [IA]DE102011122580 (ADENSIS GMBH [DE]) [I] 10-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0028] * [A] 1-9; | [IA]EP2693588 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [I] 10-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0033] * [A] 1-9; | [XA] - PETER ESSLINGER ET AL, "Increasing grid transmission capacity and power quality by a new solar inverter concept and inbuilt data communication", INNOVATIVE SMART GRID TECHNOLOGIES CONFERENCE EUROPE (ISGT EUROPE), 2010 IEEE PES, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101011), ISBN 978-1-4244-8508-6, pages 1 - 8, XP031803679 [X] 10-12 * the whole document * [A] 1-9 | [IA] - MARK MCGRANAGHAN, "Introduction and Schedule ; 2011 CIRED Panel Tutorial binder_AH", IEEE DRAFT; 2011 CIRED PANEL TUTORIAL BINDER_AH, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20110602), vol. td.dist.da;15.06.08, pages 1 - 276, XP068032382 [I] 10-12 * pages 8-15 * * pages 29-38 * * pages 50-70 * * pages 96-98 * * pages 101,188, * [A] 1-9 | Examination | DE102011012695 | other | DE102011012695 | - Etherden Nicholas, "Increasing the Hosting Capacity of Distributed Energy Resources Using Storage and Communication", DOCTORAL Thesis, (20140101), pages 1 - 132, DOCTORAL Thesis, URL: http://212.85.76.103/index.pl?id=18724, (20220407), XP055910401 | - Geibel D, M. Pfalzgraf., Tschendel C., Degner T., Bulo T., Seibel A., Sutter F., Hug T., Muller P., Boldt K., "Active, intelligent low voltage networks - concept, realisation and field test results", Electricity Distribution (CIRED 2013), 22nd International Conference and Exhibition on, (20130610), doi:10.1049/cp.2013.0947, ISBN 978-1-84919-732-8, pages 1 - 4, XP055910409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/cp.2013.0947 | Opposition | US5760492 | WO2012037989 | DE102011012695 | DE102011122580 | - ESSLINGER, P. et al., "Increasing grid transmission capacity and power quality by a new solar inverter concept and inbuilt data communication", 2010 IEEE PES Innovative Smart Grid Technolo- gies Conference Europe (ISGT Europe, (20100000), ISSN 2165-4816, pages 1 - 8, XP031803679 | - Rahimi S; Marinelli M; Silvestro F, "Evaluation of requirements for Volt/Var Control and Optimization function in Distribution Management Systems", 2nd IEEE ENERGYCON Conference & Exhibition, (20120000), pages 331 - 336, XP032466696 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/EnergyCon.2012.6347777 | - Liang Ruey-Hsun, Chen Yu-Kai, Chen Yie-Tone, "Volt/Var control in a distribution system by a fuzzy optimization approach", Electrical Power and Energy Systems, (20100000), vol. 33, no. 2011, pages 278 - 287, XP027578962 | - ERHAN DEMIROK et al., "Local Reactive Power Control Methods for Overvoltage Prevention of Distributed Solar In- verters in Low-Voltage Grids", IEEE JOURNAL OF PHOTO- VOLTAICS, (20111200), vol. 1, no. 2, doi:10.1109/JPHOTOV.2011.2174821, pages 174 - 182, XP011390854 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPHOTOV.2011.2174821 |