EP3047911 - Separating device for retention of magnetic particles in a fluid and protection device for a functional element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.2017 [2017/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECP Entwicklungsgesellschaft mbH Wiesenweg 10 12247 Berlin / DE | [2016/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Er, Sami Pohlstraße 44 10785 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Simon, Cornelia Vollmannstraße 51 81925 München / DE | 03 /
Schumacher, Jörg Potsdamer Straße 19 14513 Teltow / DE | 04 /
Liebing, Reiner Gaillardstraße 35 13187 Berlin / DE | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/30] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 12 10719 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 15152205.9 | 22.01.2015 | [2016/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3047911 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B03C1/28, B03C1/033, B03C1/30, A61M25/01 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
B03C1/286 (EP);
A61M60/414 (EP,US);
A61M60/13 (EP,US);
A61M60/216 (EP,US);
B03C1/0332 (EP);
B03C1/0335 (EP);
B03C1/288 (EP);
B03C1/30 (EP);
A61M60/148 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Separiereinrichtung zur Rückhaltung von in einem Fluid befindlichen magnetischen Partikeln sowie Schutzreinrichtung für ein Funktionselement | [2016/30] | English: | Separating device for retention of magnetic particles in a fluid and protection device for a functional element | [2016/30] | French: | Dispositif de séparation destiné à retenir des particules magnétiques se trouvant dans un fluide et dispositif de protection pour un élément de fonction | [2016/30] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/32] | 09.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3043746 (SANDERSON CHARLES H [US]) [X] 1-7,11,14 * figure 1 * * Seite 13, letzter Absatz - Seite 17, zweiter Absatz *; | [Y]EP0873719 (CONVERGENZA AG [LI]) [Y] 12 * figure 2 * * column 5, line 30 - line 42 *; | [A]EP1149632 (USF FILTRATION [FR]) [A] 1-11,14 * figures 1,2 ** paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] *; | [XI]WO2008101352 (SIMONSON ROGER M [CA]) [X] 1-5,11 * figures 1,2,4,7,8 * * page 4, line 11 - page 6, line 9 * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 9 * [I] 6,7; | [XYI]US2010331753 (GANDINI ALBERTO [US]) [X] 1-3,11,13,14 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0076] * [Y] 12 [I] 8-10; | [X]DE102010042723 (MILTENYI BIOTEC GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,11,14 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] *; | [XI]US2012145641 (REBO JUSTIN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11 * figures 2-4 * [I] 8-10; | [XI]US2014263077 (LOMBARDI MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 4 * * page 29 - page 41 * [I] 8-10 |