EP2947100 - Oral compositions for the treatment or the prevention of infections by E. Coli [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galenagen, LLC 800 Westchester Avenue, Suite 528 Rye Brook, NY 10573 / US | [2020/11] |
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states Galenagen, LLC 411 Theodore Fremd Avenue, Suite 206 Rye, NY 10580 / US | ||
Former [2017/22] | For all designated states Galenagen, LLC 411 Theodore Fremd Avenue, Suite 206 Rye, NY 10580 / US | ||
Former [2015/48] | For all designated states Curelon LLC 411 Theodore Fremd Avenue, Suite 206s Rye, NY 10580 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fallon, Joan M. 411 Theodore Fremd Avenue Suite 206S Rye, NY 10580 / US | 02 /
Heil, Matthew 47 Timber Lake Road Sherman Connecticut 06784 / US | 03 /
Fallon, James J. 11 Wampus Close Armonk New York 10504 / US | [2019/19] |
Former [2015/48] | 01 /
Fallon, Joan M. 1180 Midland Avenue Bronxville New York, 10708 / US | ||
02 /
Heil, Matthew 47 Timber Lake Road Sherman Connecticut 06784 / US | |||
03 /
Fallon, James J. 11 Wampus Close Armonk New York 10504 / US | Representative(s) | HGF 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/19] | HGF Limited 8th Floor 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | ||
Former [2015/48] | Patent Boutique LLP 37 Vanbrugh Park London SE3 7AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 15152332.1 | 06.01.2010 | [2015/48] | Priority number, date | US20090142718P | 06.01.2009 Original published format: US 142718 P | US20090153279P | 17.02.2009 Original published format: US 153279 P | US20090170856P | 20.04.2009 Original published format: US 170856 P | [2015/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2947100 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2947100 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K17/00, A61K38/47, A61K38/48, A61K38/46, A61P31/04 | [2015/48] | CPC: |
A61K38/4826 (EP,US);
A61K38/43 (GB,KR);
A61K38/46 (GB);
A01N63/50 (EP,US);
A61K35/12 (KR);
A61K38/00 (KR);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K38/1709 (GB);
A61K38/465 (EP,US);
A61K38/47 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P31/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07K14/47 (GB);
C07K17/00 (GB);
| C-Set: |
A01N63/50, A01N63/50 (US,EP);
A61K38/465, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/47, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/4826, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2015/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Orale Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung oder Prävention von Infektionen durch E. Coli | [2019/19] | English: | Oral compositions for the treatment or the prevention of infections by E. Coli | [2015/48] | French: | Compositions orales pour le traitement ou la prévention d'infections par E. coli | [2015/48] |
Former [2015/48] | Orale Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung oder Prävention von Infektionen durch E. Coli | Examination procedure | 25.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 10.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 02.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10729467.0 / EP2373693 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.01.2010 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | LT | 08.05.2019 | LV | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | MK | 08.05.2019 | MT | 08.05.2019 | PL | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | SM | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | NO | 08.08.2019 | IS | 08.09.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | BE | 31.01.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 06.01.2010 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
IS | 08.09.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2022/28] | HU | 06.01.2010 | |
AT | 08.05.2019 | ||
CY | 08.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
MT | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
PL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
SM | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 08.05.2019 | |
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
LV | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 08.05.2019 | |
LT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NO | 08.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006031554 (NOVOZYMES NORTH AMERICA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 4; example 4 *; | [A]WO2006044529 (ALTUS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2006198838 (FALLON JOAN M [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I] - SERNA ANTONIO 4TH ET AL, "Pathogenesis and treatment of Shiga toxin-producing Escherichia coli infections.", CURRENT OPINION IN GASTROENTEROLOGY JAN 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18043231, (200801), vol. 24, no. 1, ISSN 1531-7056, pages 38 - 47, XP009157370 [I] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/MOG.0b013e3282f2dfb8 | by applicant | US3536809 | US3598123 | US3710795 | US3786615 | US3845770 | US3916899 | USRE28819E | US4008719 | US4044126 | US4199322 | US4328245 | US4358603 | US4364923 | US4395454 | US4409239 | US4410545 | US4414209 | US4710384 | US5059595 | US5073543 | US5120548 | WO9219709 | WO9219708 | US5354556 | US5591767 | US5639476 | US5674533 | US5733566 | US5860957 | US5948433 | US5983134 | US5985317 | US6010715 | US6024975 | US6167301 | US6256533 | US6261595 | US6267983 | - Merck Index, MERCK & COMPANY | - BAILEY; SCOTT, Diagnostic Microbiology, (1990), page 177 | - U.S. PHARMACOPEIA NATIONAL FORMULARY, (1990), pages 1857 - 1859 | - BARRY ET AL., Pharmacology of the Skin, KARGER, (1987), vol. 1, pages 121 - 137 | - BARRY, J. CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1987), vol. 6, pages 85 - 97 | - "Susceptibility testing of antimicrobials in liquid media", AMSTERDAM, D., Antibiotics in Laboratory Medicine, WILLIAMS AND WILKINS, (1996), pages 52 - 111 | - M7-A58, NATIONAL COMMITTEE FOR CLINICAL LABORATORY STANDARDS (NCCLS | US20090386051 |