EP2903091 - System for electrically interconnecting at least one first device and one second device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hypertac S.A. 31, rue Isidore Maille 76410 Saint-Aubin-les-Elbeuf / FR | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Yvan 364 rue de la ferme Leroy 76500 ELBEUF / FR | 02 /
Ilie, Razvan 2 square Marigny 78150 ROCQUENCOURT / FR | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/32] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15152373.5 | 23.01.2015 | [2015/32] | Priority number, date | FR20140050688 | 29.01.2014 Original published format: FR 1450688 | [2015/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2903091 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01R11/28, H01M2/30, H01M10/60, H01M2/10, H01M2/20, // H01R101/00 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
H01R11/288 (EP,CN,US);
H01R11/281 (US);
H01M50/209 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/24 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/249 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/503 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/51 (EP,CN,US);
H01M2220/20 (EP,US);
H01R2101/00 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/32] | H01R11/28, H01M2/30, H01M10/60, // H01R101/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur elektrischen Verbindung mindestens eines Geräts mit einem zweiten Gerät | [2015/32] | English: | System for electrically interconnecting at least one first device and one second device | [2015/32] | French: | Système pour connecter électriquement au moins un premier équipement et un deuxième équipement entre eux | [2015/32] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 05.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 14.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0834944 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,12 * figures 1,2,5 * [Y] 3,5-8 [I] 11; | [Y]US2004166727 (LING PUI TSANG PETER [CN], et al) [Y] 3 * figure 4 *; | [A]WO2005043650 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 29 *; | [Y]US2006083980 (CHOO HYUN S [KR], et al) [Y] 6,8 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0030] *; | [Y]US2012034499 (MEEHAN HENRY M [US]) [Y] 7 * figure 2 *; | [Y]WO2012051510 (MARK GREGORY THOMAS [US]) [Y] 5 * figure 7 * |