EP2905669 - Pressure control valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kendrion (Villingen) GmbH Wilhelm-Binder-Strasse 4-6 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heingl, Ralf Hochfirststraße 5 78054 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 02 /
Burkart, Harald Sturmbühlstraße 170 78054 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | 03 /
Bergfeld, Björn Am Schaffhaus 11 72336 Balingen-Endingen / DE | 04 /
Lehmann, Volker Herdstr. 80 78087 Mönchweiler / DE | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [2015/33] | Application number, filing date | 15152793.4 | 28.01.2015 | [2015/33] | Priority number, date | DE201410101664 | 11.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014101664 | [2015/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2905669 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2905669 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2905669 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/20, F16K31/02, F16K31/06, F02M63/02 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
F16K31/0662 (EP,US);
F16K1/00 (CN);
F16K31/0668 (US);
F02M63/0052 (EP,US);
F16K1/32 (CN);
F16K3/316 (US);
F16K31/0658 (CN);
F16K31/0693 (EP,US);
G05D16/20 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | G05D16/20, F16K31/02, F16K31/06 | ||
Former IPC [2015/33] | G05D16/20, F16K31/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] |
Former [2015/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Druckregelventil | [2015/33] | English: | Pressure control valve | [2015/33] | French: | Vanne de régulation de pression | [2015/33] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2016 | Examination requested [2016/25] | 21.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | HR | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | MK | 22.03.2017 | MT | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | RS | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | SM | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | NO | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | CY | 22.03.2017 | |
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | DK | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | DK | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MT | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | DK | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 22.03.2017 | |
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | EE | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | EE | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5178359 (STOBBS THOMAS J [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 4, line 15 - page 6, line 20 *; | [A]WO0246622 (MANNESMANN REXROTH AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 5 - page 10, line 31; figures 1-2 *; | [A]DE102007053649 (HYDRAULIK RING GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0015] - [0046]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2444652 (KENDRION BINDER MAGNETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0003] - [0009] - [0 27] - [0033]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102010049035 (KENDRION BINDER MAGNETE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102012111106 (KENDRION VILLINGEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0012] - [0 17] , [0 41] - [0048]; claims 1, 5-7, 10 * | by applicant | WO2012123086 |