EP2905057 - Toy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PEA & Promoplast S.r.l. Corso Lombardia, 79 10099 San Mauro Torinese (TO) / IT | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aprile di Cimia, Valerio Strada dei Forni e Goffi, 78 I-10132 Torino / IT | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Buzzi, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 15152983.1 | 29.01.2015 | [2015/33] | Priority number, date | IT2014TO00100 | 07.02.2014 Original published format: IT TO20140100 | [2015/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2905057 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/00 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
A63H33/00 (EP,US);
A63F9/088 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2015/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spielzeug | [2015/33] | English: | Toy | [2015/33] | French: | Jouet | [2015/33] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 01.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN2061472U (YANG FUTIAN [CN]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]US5845904 (HAWKINS VICTOR J [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 12; figure - *; | [A]US2003061747 (PROST CHRISTIAN [HK]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019]; figure - *; | [A]WO2007089160 (STOLTEN ELIZABETH MARY [NZ], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 7, line 3 - line 32; figure - *; | [A]EP2343108 (INTERMED ASIA LTD [CN]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0021]; figure - * |