EP2907416 - Temperature controlled display cabinet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Norpe Oy Teollisuustie 7 06150 Porvoo / FI | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sillanpää, Jani Niittäjäntie 6 FI-07230 Monninkylä / FI | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy, Helsinki & Oulu P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Berggren Oy Ab P.O. Box 16 Antinkatu 3 C 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 15153034.2 | 29.01.2015 | [2015/34] | Priority number, date | FI20140005140 | 13.02.2014 Original published format: FI 20145140 | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2907416 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47F3/04, F25D17/08 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
F25D17/08 (EP);
A47F3/0434 (FI);
A47F3/0408 (EP,FI);
A47F3/0426 (EP,FI);
F25D2317/067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2015/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Temperaturgesteuerter Schaukasten | [2015/34] | English: | Temperature controlled display cabinet | [2015/34] | French: | Armoire de présentation à température contrôlée | [2015/34] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 14.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6247773 (HARIGAI KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * column 2, lines 48-65 * [I] 4,7,9,10; | [X]US4478047 (IBRAHIM FAYEZ F [US]) [X] 1-3,5,8 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 19; figures 1-2 *; | [X]JP2002345607 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-3,5,8 * paragraphs [0015] - [0016]; figures 1-5 * |