EP3050621 - Metathesis catalyst and process for producing olefin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMH Co., Ltd. 1 Siam Cement Road Bangsue 10800 Bangkok / TH | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/31] | For all designated states Terramark Markencreation GmbH Wachmannstrasse 1 b 28209 Bremen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suriye, Kongkiat c/o SCG Chemicals 1 Siam Cement Road Bangsue Sub-district Bangsue District 10800 Bangkok / TH | 02 /
Khemthong, Burin c/o SCG Chemicals Co. Ltd. No. 1 Siam Cement Road Bangsue Sub-district Bangsue District 10800 Bangkok / TH | 03 /
Sanwanich, Mathukorn c/o SCG Chemicals Co., Ltd. No. 1 Siam Cement Road Bangsue Sub-district Bangsue District 10800 Bangkok / TH | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Scholz, Volker Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Scholz, Volker Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15153277.7 | 30.01.2015 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050621 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/00, B01J23/02, B01J29/076, B01J29/16, B01J37/04, B01J27/232, B01J27/25, C07C6/04, // B01J29/48, B01J29/69, B01J29/78, B01J23/24, B01J23/32, B01J38/12 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
C07C6/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J35/19 (KR);
B01J23/30 (CN,US);
B01J23/007 (EP,CN,US);
B01J23/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J23/24 (EP,CN,US);
B01J23/32 (EP,CN,US);
B01J27/232 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J27/25 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J29/076 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J29/163 (EP,CN,US);
B01J29/166 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J29/48 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01J29/69 (EP,CN,US);
B01J29/7815 (EP,CN,US);
B01J29/7876 (EP,CN,US);
B01J37/0018 (KR);
B01J37/0201 (CN,US);
B01J37/04 (EP,CN,US);
B01J37/08 (CN,US);
B01J38/12 (EP,CN,US);
C07C11/06 (KR);
C07C2521/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07C2521/08 (EP,CN,US);
C07C2521/10 (EP,CN,US);
C07C2523/30 (CN,US);
C07C2527/232 (CN,US);
C07C2529/08 (CN,US);
C07C2529/16 (EP,CN,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US);
Y02P20/584 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C6/04, C07C11/06 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2016/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Metathesekatalysator und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Olefin | [2016/31] | English: | Metathesis catalyst and process for producing olefin | [2016/31] | French: | Catalyseur pour métathèse et procédé de production d'oléfine | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5120896 (KEMP RICHARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 1, line 53 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 68 - column 5, line 13 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO0112570 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL]) [X] 1-9 * examples 27,39 * * page 7, line 19 - line 29 * * page 9, line 12 - line 22 * * page 10, line 20 - line 29 * * page 11, line 27 - page 12, line 5 *; | [I]US2008312485 (TAKAI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraphs [0108] - [0110]; example 1 *; | [A]US2011152595 (TAKAI TOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0020] - [0024] - [0027] *; | [X]EP2786978 (SCG CHEMICALS CO LTD [TH]) [X] 1-14 * example -; claim - * * paragraphs [0014] , [0020] - [0024] *; | [A] - LIU H ET AL, "Production of propene from 1-butene metathesis reaction on tungsten based heterogeneous catalysts", JOURNAL OF NATURAL GAS CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER, US, CN, vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S1003-9953(08)60113-9, ISSN 1003-9953, (200909), pages 331 - 336, (20090901), XP026674902 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * 2.1 Catalyst preparation and its evaluation 4. Conclusions * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1003-9953(08)60113-9 | [A] - ROBERT L BANKS ET AL, "New developments and concepts in enhancing activities of heterogeneous metathesis catalysts", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS, ELSEVIER, NL, (198501), vol. 28, no. 1-3, ISSN 0304-5102, pages 117 - 131, XP009136081 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2010145126 | US2010191030 | US2013252804 |