EP3053647 - Tube reactor and method for continuous polymerization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LANXESS International SA Route Louis Braille 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2016/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ritter, Joachim Neukronenberger Straße 63 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | Deblon, Jörg-Stephan LANXESS Deutschland GmbH LEX-IPR Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | Deblon, Jörg-Stephan LANXESS Deutschland GmbH Kennedyplatz 1 50569 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 15154112.5 | 06.02.2015 | [2016/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3053647 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/18, B01J8/00, C08F2/00 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
B01J19/1837 (EP,CN,US);
B01J8/0015 (EP,CN,US);
B01J19/18 (RU);
C08F10/00 (CN);
C08F110/10 (EP,CN,US);
C08F2/00 (RU);
C08F2/01 (CN);
C08F36/08 (US);
B01J2208/00761 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00085 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00094 (EP,CN,US);
B01J2219/00114 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rohrreaktor und Verfahren zur mehrphasigen Polymerisation | [2016/32] | English: | Tube reactor and method for continuous polymerization | [2016/32] | French: | Réacteur tubulaire et procédé de polymérisation multiphases | [2016/32] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/33] | 23.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1693786 (ISAK ISAACHSEN) [X] 1,4,6 * page 1, line 93 - page 2, line 3; figure 1 *; | [X]US4395523 (KIRCH WILLIAM) [X] 1-4,11 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 12; figure 1 *; | [X]WO03039739 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,10-12,15 * figures 1,6,5; claims 1,50 *; | [A]US2007078237 (MCELVAIN ROBERT R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2012013794 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE], et al) [A] 5* abstract * | by applicant | EP1591459 |