EP2905698 - Electronic device and method for controlling displays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Seong Eun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Seon Il 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Young Hoon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Jung, Jung Han 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Kim, Ju Nyun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Park, Jung Sik 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 07 /
Cha, Do Hun 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 08 /
Choi, Seung Ki 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 09 /
Kim, Soo Hyung 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 10 /
Lee, Chang Wan 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 11 /
Hong, Myung Gon 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 12 /
Hong, Hyun Ju 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2015/33] | Application number, filing date | 15154149.7 | 06.02.2015 | [2015/33] | Priority number, date | KR20140013875 | 06.02.2014 Original published format: KR 20140013875 | KR20140056983 | 13.05.2014 Original published format: KR 20140056983 | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2905698 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2905698 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
G06F3/1438 (EP,US);
G06F1/1605 (US);
G06F1/1626 (EP,US);
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
G06F1/1635 (EP,US);
G06F1/1641 (EP,US);
G06F1/1643 (EP,US);
G06F1/1647 (EP,US);
G06F1/1688 (EP,US);
G06F1/1694 (EP,US);
G06F1/3265 (EP,US);
G06F3/013 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F3/1446 (EP,US);
G09G5/14 (EP,US);
G06F2200/1634 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04101 (EP,US);
G09G2300/023 (EP,US);
G09G2354/00 (EP,US);
G09G2360/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektronische Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung von Anzeigen | [2015/33] | English: | Electronic device and method for controlling displays | [2015/33] | French: | Dispositif électronique et son procédé de contrôle d'affichage | [2015/33] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 23.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 29.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/22] | 10.01.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2129084 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 7,8,15 * paragraphs [0198] - [0204] - [0235] , [0282] , [0284]; figures 30,46A,46B,49,52c,53b,53c,55b *; | [Y]US2010328223 (MOCKARRAM-DORRI MOHAMMAD ALI [DK], et al) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0101] , [0102] , [0192]; figure 4c *; | [Y]EP2296355 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 7,8* paragraphs [0093] - [0099]; figures 2-3 *; | [X]US2012032972 (HWANG BYUNGHEE [KR]) [X] 1-5,9-11 * paragraphs [0009] - [0013] - [0072] - [0074] - [0121] - [0122] - [0129] , [0134] , [0143] , [0145] - [0148] - [0153] - [0158]; figures 1,4,5,8,9 *; | [X]EP2426597 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-5,9-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] - [0012] - [0000] , [0034] - [0035] - [0040] , [0044] , [0072] , [0074] , [0079] , [0085] - [0086] - [0107] , [0112] , [0151] , [0160] * * paragraphs [0169] , [0215]; figures 1-22 *; | [X]KR101188978B (KO DON HO [KR]) [X] 1-3,14 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP2605508 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0050] , [0051] , [0069] , [0070] *; | [X]EP2626852 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,9-11 * paragraphs [0008] , [0014] , [0020] , [0022] , [0026] , [0033] - [0037] - [0050] - [0051]; figures 2-6,12 *; | [XAYI]US2013314338 (NAM KEE-HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,9-12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] - [0037] - [0046] - [0052] - [0054] - [0056] , [0058] , [0059] , [0070]; figures 1-6 * [A] 13 [Y] 6-8,14,15 [I] 4,5; | [Y]KR200470477Y (KO DON HO) [Y] 14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP2693331 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-5,9-11 * paragraphs [0057] - [0058] - [0064] , [0093] - [0102] - [0112] , [0129] , [0137] - [0139] - [0000] , [0187] - [0188] - [0212] - [0223]; figures 1-7,9,15,29-32 *; | [Y] - DigInfo TV, "1mm thick piezo film speaker from Kyocera used in LG's curved-screen OLED TV #DigInfo", (20130901), URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=K2NG0eNabhQ, (20150723), XP054975984 [Y] 7,8 * the whole document * |