EP2907721 - Device for controlling the opening of at least one door of a railway vehicle, vehicle comprising such a device and related control method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport Technologies 48, rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2016/41] | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport Technologies 48 rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | ||
Former [2015/34] | For all designated states ALSTOM Transport Technologies 3, avenue André Malraux 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Classen, Annegret 30 rue Pierre Curie 59195 Herin / FR | 02 /
Setan, Frédéric 8 allée de la fontaine huguenie 59269 Sepmeries / FR | 03 /
Bailly, Sébastien 12 rue de Niederbronn 67110 Oberbronn / FR | 04 /
Sauvage, Patrick 188 chemin de Val en sol 83470 Saint Maximin La Sainte Beaume / FR | 05 /
Pressouyre, Guillaume 403 avenue Jean Monnet Entrée 2 BAT 8 Résidence Château Double 13090 Aix en Provence / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2015/34] | 01 /
Classen, Annegret 30 rue Pierre Curie 59195 HERIN / FR | ||
02 /
Setan, Frédéric 8 allée de la fontaine huguenie 59269 SEPMERIES / FR | |||
03 /
Bailly, Sébastien 12 rue de Niederbronn 67110 OBERBRONN / FR | |||
04 /
Sauvage, Patrick 188 chemin de Val en sol 83470 SAINT MAXIMIN LA SAINTE BEAUME / FR | |||
05 /
Pressouyre, Guillaume 403 avenue Jean Monnet Entrée 2 BAT 8 Résidence Château Double 13090 AIX EN PROVENCE / FR | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2015/34] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15154720.5 | 11.02.2015 | [2015/34] | Priority number, date | FR20140000381 | 11.02.2014 Original published format: FR 1400381 | [2015/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2907721 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2907721 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B61D19/02 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
B61D19/026 (EP);
G01S15/04 (EP);
G01S17/04 (EP);
Y02T30/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2015/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung zur Öffnung mindestens einer Tür eines Schienenfahrzeugs, Fahrzeug, das eine solche Vorrichtung umfasst, und entsprechendes Steuerverfahren | [2015/34] | English: | Device for controlling the opening of at least one door of a railway vehicle, vehicle comprising such a device and related control method | [2015/34] | French: | Dispositif de commande de l'ouverture d'au moins une porte d'un véhicule ferroviaire, véhicule comportant un tel dispositif et procédé de commande associé | [2015/34] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 21.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 29.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2015 | AL | 10.06.2020 | AT | 10.06.2020 | CY | 10.06.2020 | CZ | 10.06.2020 | EE | 10.06.2020 | HR | 10.06.2020 | LT | 10.06.2020 | LV | 10.06.2020 | MC | 10.06.2020 | MK | 10.06.2020 | MT | 10.06.2020 | RO | 10.06.2020 | RS | 10.06.2020 | SI | 10.06.2020 | SK | 10.06.2020 | SM | 10.06.2020 | BG | 10.09.2020 | GR | 11.09.2020 | IS | 10.10.2020 | PT | 12.10.2020 | GB | 11.02.2021 | IE | 11.02.2021 | LU | 11.02.2021 | BE | 28.02.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 11.02.2015 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
MK | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
GB | 11.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.02.2021 | ||
LU | 11.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 11.02.2015 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CY | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
GB | 11.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.02.2021 | ||
LU | 11.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 11.02.2015 | |
AL | 10.06.2020 | ||
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
GB | 11.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.02.2021 | ||
LU | 11.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
GB | 11.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.02.2021 | ||
LU | 11.02.2021 | ||
BE | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
GB | 11.02.2021 | ||
IE | 11.02.2021 | ||
LU | 11.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
IE | 11.02.2021 | ||
LU | 11.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
LU | 11.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
MC | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SI | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SK | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
IS | 10.10.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
AT | 10.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2020 | ||
EE | 10.06.2020 | ||
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RO | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
SM | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
PT | 12.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 10.06.2020 | |
HR | 10.06.2020 | ||
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
BG | 10.09.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
RS | 10.06.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 10.06.2020 | |
LT | 10.06.2020 | ||
LV | 10.06.2020 | ||
GR | 11.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 10.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9858148 (SENSOTECH LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]EP1382506 (SAFECOM ENGINEERING AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1418443 (ALSTOM [FR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XI]FR2942195 (FAIVELEY TRANSPORT [FR]) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [I] 7-9; | [XI]EP2423708 (FAIVELEY TRANSPORT [FR]) [X] 1-3,9-12 * the whole document * [I] 5-8 | by applicant | WO9858148 |