EP2921684 - Integrated primary nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/39] | INTEGRATED PRIMARY NOZZLE | ||
[2018/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2019/29] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cerra, David F. 9801 27th Ave. W. Everett, WA Washington 98204 / US | 02 /
Tretow, Paul R. 9801 27th Ave. W. Everett, WA Washington 98204 / US | 03 /
Willie, Robert H. 9801 27th Ave. W. Everett, WA Washington 98204 / US | 04 /
Carter, III, Robert B. 9701 24th Pl. W. Everett, WA Washington 98204 / US | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/39] | Application number, filing date | 15154851.8 | 12.02.2015 | [2015/39] | Priority number, date | US201414219143 | 19.03.2014 Original published format: US201414219143 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2921684 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2921684 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02K1/44, F02K1/34, F02K1/52, F02K1/82, F02K3/06 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
F02K1/827 (EP,US);
B23P15/008 (US);
B64D33/06 (EP,US);
F02K1/44 (EP,US);
F02K1/52 (EP,US);
F02K3/06 (EP,US);
F05D2230/53 (EP,US);
F05D2230/60 (EP,US);
F05D2250/283 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Integrierte Primärdüse | [2018/45] | English: | Integrated primary nozzle | [2018/41] | French: | Tuyère primaire intégrée | [2018/41] |
Former [2015/39] | INTEGRIERTE PRIMÄRDÜSE | ||
Former [2015/39] | INTEGRATED PRIMARY NOZZLE | ||
Former [2015/39] | TUYÈRE PRIMAIRE INTÉGRÉE | Examination procedure | 29.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 14.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.02.2015 | AL | 17.07.2019 | AT | 17.07.2019 | CY | 17.07.2019 | CZ | 17.07.2019 | DK | 17.07.2019 | EE | 17.07.2019 | FI | 17.07.2019 | HR | 17.07.2019 | LT | 17.07.2019 | LV | 17.07.2019 | MC | 17.07.2019 | MK | 17.07.2019 | MT | 17.07.2019 | NL | 17.07.2019 | PL | 17.07.2019 | RO | 17.07.2019 | RS | 17.07.2019 | SE | 17.07.2019 | SI | 17.07.2019 | SK | 17.07.2019 | SM | 17.07.2019 | TR | 17.07.2019 | BG | 17.10.2019 | NO | 17.10.2019 | GR | 18.10.2019 | IS | 17.11.2019 | PT | 18.11.2019 | IE | 12.02.2020 | LU | 12.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 12.02.2015 | |
AL | 17.07.2019 | ||
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
MT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 12.02.2020 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
LU | 12.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 17.07.2019 | |
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 17.07.2019 | |
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 17.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2372779 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,12 * figures 8-10 * * claim 46 * * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 3, line 6 - line 12 * * page 19, line 26 - page 21, line 10 * [I] 4,5,7,10,11; | [XI]EP1561939 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,12 * figures 3, 6 * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * [I] 4,5,7,10,11; | [A]US2008044280 (LE DOCTE THIERRY J A [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2009019857 (TISDALE RUDOLPH MORRIS [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO2013121150 (HERAKLES [FR]) [A] 1-13* figures 1-3 * |