EP2924973 - OPTO-ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ITS ADJUSTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strohmeier, Dr. Dirk Habsburgerstrasse 38 79104 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
Schneider, Dr. Florian Am Pfahlgraben 4 79276 Reute / DE | 03 /
Bertz, Denise Alte Bundesstr. 70 79194 Gundelfingen / DE | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Hehl, Ulrich SICK AG Intellectual Property Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 15155872.3 | 20.02.2015 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | DE201410104028 | 24.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014104028 | [2015/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2924973 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2924973 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2924973 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, G02B3/12, H04N17/00 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
G02B27/648 (EP,CN,US);
G02B26/004 (EP,CN,US);
H04N17/002 (EP,CN,US);
G01V8/12 (EP,CN,US);
G01V8/20 (EP,CN,US);
G02B1/06 (US);
G02B3/12 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] |
Former [2015/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM JUSTIEREN | [2015/40] | English: | OPTO-ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ITS ADJUSTMENT | [2015/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE | [2015/40] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2015 | AL | 12.04.2017 | CY | 12.04.2017 | CZ | 12.04.2017 | EE | 12.04.2017 | ES | 12.04.2017 | FI | 12.04.2017 | HR | 12.04.2017 | LT | 12.04.2017 | LV | 12.04.2017 | MC | 12.04.2017 | MK | 12.04.2017 | MT | 12.04.2017 | PL | 12.04.2017 | PT | 12.04.2017 | RO | 12.04.2017 | RS | 12.04.2017 | SI | 12.04.2017 | SK | 12.04.2017 | SM | 12.04.2017 | TR | 12.04.2017 | BG | 12.07.2017 | NO | 12.07.2017 | GR | 13.07.2017 | IS | 12.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 20.02.2015 | |
CY | 12.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MK | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 20.02.2015 | |
CZ | 12.04.2017 | ||
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
PT | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
TR | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MC | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
MT | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SI | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
SM | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 12.04.2017 | |
EE | 12.04.2017 | ||
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RO | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
SK | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 12.04.2017 | |
ES | 12.04.2017 | ||
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 12.04.2017 | |
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
LV | 12.04.2017 | ||
PL | 12.04.2017 | ||
RS | 12.04.2017 | ||
BG | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 12.04.2017 | |
FI | 12.04.2017 | ||
HR | 12.04.2017 | ||
LT | 12.04.2017 | ||
NO | 12.07.2017 | ||
GR | 13.07.2017 | ||
IS | 12.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004342228 (KONICA MINOLTA OPTO INC) [X] 1-5,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0023] - [0035] - [0042] *; | [X]US2012307089 (RUKES JASON R [US]) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0029] - [0032] - [0046] - [0050]; figures 1-15 *; | [X]US2004227838 (ATARASHI YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraphs [0071] , [0092] , [0106] , [0114]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2012113318 (GALSTIAN TIGRAN [CA], et al) [X] 1-5,9 * paragraphs [0069] - [0072] - [0083] - [0086]; figures 1-20 *; | [A]DE102012104579 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-5,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0029] - [0039] * | Examination | DE102005021735 | by applicant | DE102005015500 | DE202006017268U | EP2071367 |