EP2916322 - Voice processing device, noise suppression method, and computer-readable recording medium storing voice processing program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2015/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Chikako c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2015/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/37] | Application number, filing date | 15156291.5 | 24.02.2015 | [2015/37] | Priority number, date | JP20140040649 | 03.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014040649 | [2015/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2916322 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/0216, G10L21/0232 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
G10L21/0232 (EP,US);
G10L21/0264 (US);
G10L21/0364 (US);
G10L25/84 (US);
G10L2021/02087 (US);
G10L21/0324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/44] |
Former [2015/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sprachverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Rauschunterdrückungsverfahren und computerlesbares Aufzeichnungsmedium mit darauf gespeichertem Programm zur Sprachverarbeitung | [2015/37] | English: | Voice processing device, noise suppression method, and computer-readable recording medium storing voice processing program | [2015/37] | French: | Dispositif de traitement vocal, procédé de suppression de bruit et support d'enregistrement lisible par ordinateur stockant un programme de traitement vocal | [2015/37] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/44] | 22.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/32] | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013191118 (MAKINO KENICHI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0150] * * paragraph [0160] - paragraph [0162] *; | [A]US2011081026 (RAMAKRISHNAN DINESH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] *; | [IA] - KATO M ET AL, "NOISE SUPPRESSION WITH HIGH SPEECH QUALITY BASED ON WEIGHTED NOISE ESTIMATION AND MMSE STSA", ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, PART III - FUNDAMENTALELECTRONIC SCIENCE, WILEY, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (20060101), vol. 89, no. 2, PART 03, doi:10.1002/ECJC.20145, ISSN 1042-0967, pages 43 - 53, XP001236340 [I] 1,12,15 * page 44, column r, line 14 - page 48, column l, line 9 * [A] 2-11,13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ecjc.20145 | [A] - WESTERLUND N ET AL, "Speech enhancement for personal communication using an adaptive gain equalizer", SIGNAL PROCESSING, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 85, no. 6, ISSN 0165-1684, (20050601), pages 1089 - 1101, (20050601), XP027670886 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2012098579 | JP2001267973 | JP2010204392 | JP2007183306 | JP2010230814 |