EP3062025 - RUBBER FOOT FOR HEATABLE METAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag S:t Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tonietto, Stefano Electrolux Italia S.p.A. - Forli Factory Viale Bologna, 298 47122 Forli / IT | 02 /
Sorrentino, Emanuele Electrolux Italia S.p.A. - Forli Factory Viale Bologna, 298 47122 Forli / IT | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2018/07] |
Former [2016/35] | Baumgartl, Gerhard Willi, et al Electrolux Hausgeräte GmbH Group Patents 90327 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 15156444.0 | 25.02.2015 | [2016/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3062025 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3062025 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/10, A47B91/06 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
F24C15/107 (EP,CN,US);
A47B91/06 (EP,CN,US);
F16L59/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] |
Former [2016/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GUMMIFUSS FÜR BEHEIZBARE METALLVORRICHTUNG | [2017/37] | English: | RUBBER FOOT FOR HEATABLE METAL DEVICE | [2016/35] | French: | PIED EN CAOUTCHOUC POUR DISPOSITIF MÉTALLIQUE CHAUFFABLE | [2016/35] |
Former [2016/35] | KAUTSCHUKFUSS FÜR BEHEIZBARE METALLVORRICHTUNG | Examination procedure | 25.02.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 06.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2015 | AL | 14.02.2018 | AT | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | CZ | 14.02.2018 | DK | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | FI | 14.02.2018 | HR | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | LV | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | MK | 14.02.2018 | NL | 14.02.2018 | PL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | RS | 14.02.2018 | SE | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | SM | 14.02.2018 | TR | 14.02.2018 | IE | 25.02.2018 | LU | 25.02.2018 | MT | 25.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | NO | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | DE | 01.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 25.02.2015 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
MK | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
MT | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 25.02.2015 | |
AL | 14.02.2018 | ||
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
MT | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
MT | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
MT | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
MT | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
IE | 25.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
SM | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 25.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 14.02.2018 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LV | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RS | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
HR | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
NO | 14.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB191109734 (COHRS HUGO [DE]) [X] 1,3-6 * the whole document *; | [A]DE20302695U (OSKAR LEHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-7* figure 7 *; | [XY]WO2004023043 (CAVICCHIOLI LINO [IT]) [X] 1,3-5,11-13 * pages 6-8; figures 1-37 * [Y] 8-10,14,15; | [Y]US2008086845 (GIANANDREA MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 1-7,11-13 * paragraphs [0018] , [0034] , [0039]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2009044795 (SHAFFER TIMOTHY SCOTT [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,11-13 * paragraph [0034]; figures 1-8 *; | [Y]DE202010010785U (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 8-10 * paragraph [0024]; figures 1-3 *; | [Y] - "Bluesil HCR MM 60 THT", (20120630), URL: http://www.bluestarsilicones.com/bs/productDetails.do?dispatch=view&id=90000474&name=bluesil_mm_60_tht, (20150729), XP055205198 [Y] 14,15 * the whole document * | [AP] - "Wacker Elastosil R 750/50", (20150703), URL: http://sdb.wacker.com/pf/e/result/report.jsp?P_LANGU=E&P_SYS=2&P_SSN=1044&P_REP=00000000000000000002&P_RES=4312&P_SPEC=R, (20150729), XP055205202 [AP] 14,15 * the whole document * | Examination | US4728238 |