EP3062298 - Smoke alarm system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TROX GmbH Heinrich-Trox-Platz 1 47506 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lange, Stefan Antoniusstraße 22 47506 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Dr. Stark & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Moerser Straße 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | DR. STARK & PARTNER Patentanwälte Moerser Straße 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 15156850.8 | 27.02.2015 | [2016/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3062298 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/14 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
G08B25/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] |
Former [2016/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rauchmeldesystem | [2016/35] | English: | Smoke alarm system | [2016/35] | French: | Système détecteur de fumée | [2016/35] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/10] | 28.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.05.2019 | 10.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2637147 (SCHRANER STEFAN [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,10,12,13 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0028] * * sentence l, paragraph 41 * * paragraph [0042] * * figure 2 * [I] 3-7,9,11; | [XI]WO9422118 (NEIGHBOURLINK LTD [IE], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,13 * page 12, lines 13-20 * * page 13, lines 19-24,28,30-33 * * page 14, lines 5-7 * * page 21, lines 6-11 * * page 23, lines 31,32 * * page 24, lines 10-14 * * page 26, lines 9-20 * * page 27, lines 32-34 * * page 29, lines 21-24 * * page 30, lines 11,12 * * page 35, lines 1-6 * * page 46, lines 29-35 * * page 47, lines 5,6 * * figures 11-13 * [I] 3-7,10-12; | [A]EP0872817 (CERBERUS AG [CH]) [A] 1-13 * column 2, lines 34-38 * * column 3, lines 31,32 * * column 4, lines 3-6 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 1 * * column 6, lines 19-22 * * column 7, lines 5-9 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE102012200945 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0054] - [0057] * * sentence 1, paragraph 65 * * figure 1 * |