EP2894039 - Precursor pulse generation for inkjet printhead [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linn, Scott Hewlett-Packard Co. 1000 NE Circle Blvd., Mail Stop 631B Corvallis, OR Oregon 97330-4239 / US | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2015/29] | Application number, filing date | 15156968.8 | 22.10.2008 | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2894039 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2894039 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/38, B41J2/045 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
B41J2/04596 (EP,US);
B41J2/0458 (EP,US);
B41J2/04591 (EP,US);
B41J2/04598 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2015/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorläuferimpulserzeugung für einen Tintenstrahldruckkopf | [2015/29] | English: | Precursor pulse generation for inkjet printhead | [2015/29] | French: | Génération d'impulsions précurseurs pour tête d'impression à jet d'encre | [2015/29] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 12.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08877626.5 / EP2344340 | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2017 | CY | 01.02.2017 | CZ | 01.02.2017 | DK | 01.02.2017 | FI | 01.02.2017 | LT | 01.02.2017 | LV | 01.02.2017 | MC | 01.02.2017 | NL | 01.02.2017 | RO | 01.02.2017 | SE | 01.02.2017 | SI | 01.02.2017 | SK | 01.02.2017 | NO | 01.05.2017 | GR | 02.05.2017 | IS | 01.06.2017 | PT | 01.06.2017 | IE | 22.10.2017 | LU | 22.10.2017 | MT | 22.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | [2019/47] |
Former [2018/45] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
IE | 22.10.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
MT | 22.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
MT | 22.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
LU | 22.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
MC | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SI | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
DK | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
RO | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
SK | 01.02.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
CZ | 01.02.2017 | ||
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.02.2017 | |
FI | 01.02.2017 | ||
LT | 01.02.2017 | ||
LV | 01.02.2017 | ||
NL | 01.02.2017 | ||
SE | 01.02.2017 | ||
NO | 01.05.2017 | ||
GR | 02.05.2017 | ||
IS | 01.06.2017 | ||
PT | 01.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4563689 (MURAKAMI KIYOTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * figures 4a,4b,6,7,12 * * column 6, line 46 - line 58 * * column 10, line 9 - line 23 * * column 10, line 54 - column 11, line 17 *; | [A]US4982199 (DUNN JOHN B R [US]) [A] 1-4 * figure 2 * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 3 *; | [A]EP0710562 (CANON APTEX INC [JP]) [A] 1-4 * figures 14,16b,22 * * column 29, line 46 - column 30, line 8 *; | [A]US5815180 (BARBOUR MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP1029675 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-4 * figure 31 * |