EP2916275 - Interaction history management device, interaction device and interaction history management method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clarion Co., Ltd. 7-2, Shintoshin Chuo-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 330-0081 / JP | [2015/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duan, Qingzhu c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
Sekiguchi, Takaaki c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
Nagai, Yasushi c/o Clarion Co., Ltd. 7-2, Shintoshin, Chuo-ku Saitama-shi Saitama, 330-0081 / JP | [2015/37] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15157012.4 | 27.02.2015 | [2015/37] | Priority number, date | JP20140043918 | 06.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014043918 | [2015/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2916275 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
G06Q10/109 (EP,US);
G06F3/167 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/04847 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Interaktionshistorienverwaltungsvorrichtung, Interaktionsvorrichtung und Interaktionshistorienverwaltungsverfahren | [2015/38] | English: | Interaction history management device, interaction device and interaction history management method | [2015/37] | French: | Dispositif de gestion d'historique d'interaction, dispositif d'interaction et procédé de gestion d'historique d'interaction | [2015/38] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2015 | Examination requested [2015/37] | 07.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/15] | 16.10.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.11.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1076288 (IBM [US]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0011] , [0 13] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraphs [0019] , [0 21] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraphs [0042] , [0 59] *; | [I]US2008201135 (YANO TAKEHIDE [JP]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0003] , [00 7] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0050] , [0 53] , [0 56] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0128] * * paragraphs [0228] , [ 230] *; | [I]US2011246203 (BYRNE WILLIAM J [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0026] , [0 30] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraphs [0139] , [ 155] * * paragraph [0189] - paragraph [0195] ** paragraph [0215] - paragraph [0218] * | by applicant | JP2004179914 |