EP2928043 - RECHARGEABLE BATTERY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING POWER CONSUMPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/47] |
Former [2015/41] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sanyo-cho Daito-shi Osaka 574-8534 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohtsuki, Yousuke c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Okuda, Yasuo c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Okamoto, Kazuaki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Hirata, Yuuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/41] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/41] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15157169.2 | 02.03.2015 | [2015/41] | Priority number, date | JP20140070328 | 28.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014070328 | [2015/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2928043 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2928043 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
H02J7/0016 (EP,US);
H02J7/0014 (EP,US);
H02J7/0047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIEDERAUFLADBARES BATTERIESYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES STROMVERBRAUCHS | [2015/41] | English: | RECHARGEABLE BATTERY SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING POWER CONSUMPTION | [2015/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BATTERIE RECHARGEABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE CONSOMMATION D'ÉNERGIE | [2015/41] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/11] | 13.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2008235032 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-5,7 * abstract *; | [I]US2009027009 (SIVERTSEN DAVID [US]) [I] 1-5,7 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 9 - paragraph 13 * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 3, paragraph 36; figures 3-6; claims 1,2,5-9,14,15,18 *; | [A]WO2009106952 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [A] 1-5,7 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 15 - page 11, paragraph 47; figures 1-5 *; | [T] - DANIEL KILPER ET AL, "Energy Challenges in Current and Future Optical Transmission Networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (20120501), vol. 100, no. 5, doi:10.1109/JPROC.2012.2186102, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 1168 - 1187, XP011441694 [T] 6 * page 1176; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JPROC.2012.2186102 | by applicant | JP2011078201 |