EP2915462 - Lid for beverage container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermos L.L.C. 475 N. Martingale Road Suite 1100 Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US | For all designated states Thermos K.K. 1435, Yoshida-Shimonakano Tsubame-shi, Niigata-ken / JP | [2015/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Zhenjun c/o Thermos K.K. 1435, Yoshida-Shimonakano Tsubame-shi, Niigata / JP | 02 /
Matsuyama, Shin c/o Thermos K.K. 1435, Yoshida-Shimonakano Tsubame-shi, Niigata / JP | [2015/37] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2015/37] | Application number, filing date | 15157387.0 | 03.03.2015 | [2015/37] | Priority number, date | JP20140041829 | 04.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014041829 | [2015/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2915462 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47G19/22, B65D47/28 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
A47G19/2272 (EP,KR,US);
B65D47/286 (EP,KR,US);
B65D47/06 (CN);
B65D43/02 (US);
B65D43/20 (US);
B65D47/32 (EP,KR,US);
B65D51/248 (EP,KR,US);
B65D2251/0018 (US);
B65D2251/0081 (US);
B65D2543/00046 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Deckel für einen Getränkebehälter | [2015/37] | English: | Lid for beverage container | [2015/37] | French: | Couvercle pour conteneur de boissons | [2015/37] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/39] | 22.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6752287 (LIN SHIN-SHUOH [US]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * column 4, line 41 - column 6; figure - * [I] 3; | [X]WO2008063037 (YANG SOUNG AN [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0078]; figure 9 *; | [XI]US4057167 (LEE JIN KU) [X] 1,2,4-8 * column 4, line 64 - column 8, line 15; figure 3 * [I] 3 | by applicant | JPH03136174 | JPH03137750 |