EP2925076 - SHORT IDENTIFIERS FOR DEVICE-TO-DEVICE (D2D) BROADCAST COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/40] | Short identifiers for device-to-device (D2D) broadcast communications | ||
[2022/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2015/40] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies OY Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ribeiro, Cassio Pellavakaski 5 I 17 02340 Espoo / FI | 02 /
Korhonen, Juha Keskiyöntie 12 A 1 02210 Espoo / FI | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/08] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2015/40] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 15157916.6 | 06.03.2015 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | US201461968705P | 21.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461968705 P | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2925076 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2925076 | Date: | 22.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/70, H04W4/06, H04W76/14, H04W4/02 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H04W4/70 (EP,BR,RU,US);
H04W84/00 (RU);
H04W8/005 (CN);
H04W76/11 (BR,RU,US);
H04W48/16 (CN);
H04W72/12 (BR,RU,US);
H04W76/14 (EP,BR,RU,US);
H04W4/02 (EP,BR);
H04W4/06 (EP,BR,US);
H04W76/40 (EP,BR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/40] | H04W76/02, // H04W4/02, H04W76/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2015/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KURZE IDENTIFIKATOREN FÜR RUNDFUNKKOMMUNIKATION ZWISCHEN ZWEI GERÄTEN (D2D) | [2022/30] | English: | SHORT IDENTIFIERS FOR DEVICE-TO-DEVICE (D2D) BROADCAST COMMUNICATIONS | [2022/30] | French: | IDENTIFICATEURS COURTS POUR DES COMMUNICATIONS RADIODIFFUSÉES DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF (D2D) | [2022/30] |
Former [2015/40] | Kurze Identifikatoren für Rundfunkkommunikation zwischen zwei Geräten (D2D) | ||
Former [2015/40] | Short identifiers for device-to-device (D2D) broadcast communications | ||
Former [2015/40] | Identificateurs courts pour des communications radiodiffusées dispositif à dispositif (D2D) | Examination procedure | 18.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 18.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.02.2023 | CZ | 22.02.2023 | DK | 22.02.2023 | EE | 22.02.2023 | ES | 22.02.2023 | FI | 22.02.2023 | HR | 22.02.2023 | LT | 22.02.2023 | LV | 22.02.2023 | MC | 22.02.2023 | PL | 22.02.2023 | RO | 22.02.2023 | RS | 22.02.2023 | SE | 22.02.2023 | SI | 22.02.2023 | SK | 22.02.2023 | SM | 22.02.2023 | IE | 06.03.2023 | LU | 06.03.2023 | BE | 31.03.2023 | NO | 22.05.2023 | GR | 23.05.2023 | IS | 22.06.2023 | PT | 22.06.2023 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
MC | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
IE | 06.03.2023 | ||
LU | 06.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2024/02] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 06.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SK | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
CZ | 22.02.2023 | ||
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RO | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
EE | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
DK | 22.02.2023 | ||
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
SM | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
IS | 22.06.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
PL | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
GR | 23.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
FI | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
LV | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
SE | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 22.02.2023 | |
ES | 22.02.2023 | ||
HR | 22.02.2023 | ||
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 22.05.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | ||
RS | 22.02.2023 | ||
PT | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 22.02.2023 | |
LT | 22.02.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2011098993 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [I] 1-4,6-12,14,15 * page 1, line 3, to page 5, line 3; page 5, line 22, to page 16, line 8; figures 1-8 * [A] 5,13; | [IA]WO2012104644 (WIRELESS TECH SOLUTIONS LLC, et al) [I] 1-4,6-12,14,15 * page 1, paragraph 1, to page 4, paragraph 1; page 4, paragraph 14, to page 14, paragraph 1; figures 1-10 * [A] 5,13; | [I] - Sony, "D2D Communication Resource Scheduling", (20140130), 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 Meeting #76, R1-140589, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/DynaReport/TDocExMtg--R1-76--30639.htm, (20150814), XP055207924 [I] 1-15 * sections 1-3 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "On Scrambling of D2D Physical Channels", vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20131111 - 20131115, (20131113), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-135805 SCRAMBLING OF D2D CHANNELS V5, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/RAN1/Docs/, (20131113), XP050735446 [A] 1-15 * sections 1-5 * | [XPI] - ERICSSON, "ProSe Layer-2 Identifiers", vol. RAN WG2, no. Shanghai, China; 20141006 - 20141010, (20140926), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-144470 - PROSE LAYER-2 IDENTIFIERS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_87bis/Docs/, (20140926), XP050870406 [XP] 1-9,12-14 * sections 1-3 * [I] 10,11,15 | [XPI] - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Introduction of ProSe", vol. RAN WG2, no. Seoul, South Korea; 20140519 - 20140523, (20140518), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-142588-INTRODUCTION OF PROSE IN 36 300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20140518), XP050793680 [XP] 1,2,4-6,8,9,12-14 * sections 5, 6, 8, 23.X, 23.Y, Annex X * [I] 3,7,10,11,15 |