EP2927698 - MEASURING DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lutz, Theresa Rheinparkstr. 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Hernandez Guillen, Francisco Knospstrasse 5 70178 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Heuck, Friedjof Vogelsangstr. 111/1 70197 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
Preiss, Elisabeth Neue Strasse 67 70186 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/41] | Application number, filing date | 15158132.9 | 09.03.2015 | [2015/41] | Priority number, date | DE201410206067 | 31.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014206067 | [2015/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2927698 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/08, G01P15/13 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
G01P15/0894 (EP);
G01C19/5656 (EP);
G01P15/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/20] |
Former [2015/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSVORRICHTUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER MESSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER MESSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/41] | English: | MEASURING DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A MEASURING DEVICE | [2015/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MESURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE MESURE | [2015/41] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/20] | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 05.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2004118207 (NIENDORF ANDREAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,11-13 * page 1, paragraph 5 * [Y] 6-10 [I] 7-10,14,15; | [XYI]WO9519571 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,11-13 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10 [I] 14,15; | [XYI]US5377545 (NORLING BRIAN L [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,11-13 * column 4, line 18 - column 6, line 39; figures 1, 2 * [Y] 6-10 [I] 14,15; | [Y]EP1708291 (TDK CORP [JP]) [Y] 6-10 * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 11 * * page 4, paragraph 15 - page 8, paragraph 33; figures 1-13 * | [XYI] - CHINGWEN YEH ET AL, "A LOW-VOLTAGE BULK-SILICON TUNNELING-BASED MICROACCELEROMETER", TECHNICAL DIGEST OF THE INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING. (IEDM). WASHINGTON, DEC. 10 - 13, 1995; [TECHNICAL DIGEST OF THE INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING. (IEDM)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19951210), ISBN 978-0-7803-2701-6, pages 593 - 596, XP000624772 [X] 1-5,11-13 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10 [I] 14,15 | [XYI] - KENNY T W ET AL, "MICROMACHINES TUNNINLING DISPLACEMENT TRANSDUCERS FOR PHYSICAL SENSORS", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY: PART A, AVS /AIP, MELVILLE, NY., US, (19930701), vol. 11, no. 4, PART 01, doi:10.1116/1.578351, ISSN 0734-2101, pages 797 - 802, XP000403707 [X] 1-5,11-13 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10 [I] 14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.578351 | by applicant | US8347720 |