EP3018202 - E2EPF Ubiquitin carrier protein-von-Hippel-Lindau interaction and uses of thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Bioscience and Biotechnology 125 Gwahak-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34141 / KR | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/26] | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Bioscience and Biotechnology 125 Gwahak-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-806 / KR | ||
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Bioscience and Biotechnology 111 Gwahangno Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-806 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Im, Dong-Soo No:107-604 Hanwool Apt. Sinsung-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-345 / KR | 02 /
Jung, Cho-Rok 504 City Villa Bongmyong-dong 640-70 Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-301 / KR | 03 /
Hwang, Kyung-Sun 106-6 Jayang-dong Dong-gu Daejeon 308-830 / KR | 04 /
Jung Hwa, Lim 125 Gwahak-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-806 / KR | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2016/19] | Application number, filing date | 15158221.0 | 13.11.2006 | [2016/19] | Priority number, date | KR20050108014 | 11.11.2005 Original published format: KR 20050108014 | [2016/19] | Previously filed application, date | WO2006KR04749 | 13.11.2006 | [2016/19] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3018202 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3018202 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/00, A61K38/53, // A61P9/10 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
C12N9/93 (EP,US);
C07K1/00 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K1/06 (KR);
C07K14/4703 (EP,US);
C07K14/4738 (EP,US);
C12N15/1137 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (KR);
C12N15/867 (KR);
C12Y603/02019 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2016/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | E2EPF-Ubiquitinträger-Protein-von-Hippel-Lindau-Interaktion und Verwendungen davon | [2016/19] | English: | E2EPF Ubiquitin carrier protein-von-Hippel-Lindau interaction and uses of thereof | [2016/19] | French: | Interaction avec la protéine porteuse d'ubiquitine E2EPF-von Hippel Lindau et ses utilisations | [2018/14] |
Former [2016/19] | Interaction de maladie de protéine von Hippel Lindau et support d'ubiquitine E2EPF et utilisations associées | Examination procedure | 09.03.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06812582.2 / EP1954709 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2006 | AT | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | ES | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | IT | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | NL | 27.06.2018 | PL | 27.06.2018 | PT | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | IE | 13.11.2018 | LU | 13.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | FR | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/28] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.11.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.11.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.11.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.11.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.11.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004064711 (VERENIGING HET NL KANKER I [NL], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XP]WO2006044366 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XP] 1-5 * page 26, paragraph 10. - page 32, paragraph 15. *; | [XD] - LIU ZHI ET AL, "Characterization of a novel keratinocyte ubiquitin carrier protein", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 271, no. 5, doi:10.1074/JBC.271.5.2817, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 2817 - 2822, XP002387892 [XD] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.5.2817 | [AD] - WAGNER K W ET AL, "Overexpression, genomic amplification and therapeutic potential of inhibiting the UbcH10 ubiquitin conjugase in human carcinomas of diverse anatomic origin", ONCOGENE, (20040826), vol. 23, no. 39, ISSN 0950-9232, pages 6621 - 6629, XP002387890 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1207861 | [A] - OHH M ET AL, "Ubiquitination of hypoxia-inducible factor requires direct binding to the beta-domain of the von Hippel-Lindau protein", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, (20000701), vol. 2, no. 7, ISSN 1465-7392, pages 423 - 427, XP002388870 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35017054 | [A] - MAYNARD AND M OHH M A, "Molecular Targets from VHL studies into the oxygen-sensing pathway", CURRENT CANCER DRUG TARGETS, (200508), vol. 5, no. 5, doi:10.2174/1568009054629672, ISSN 1568-0096, pages 345 - 356, XP008126417 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2174/1568009054629672 | [XP] - JUNG CHO-ROK ET AL, "E2-EPF UCP targets pVHL for degradation and associates with tumor growth and metastasis", NATURE MEDICINE, (200607), vol. 12, no. 7, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 809 - 816, XP002603020 [XP] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NM1440 | by applicant | EP0031080 | EP0412765 | WO9818480 | WO9845331 | KR20010006460 | WO03006477 | KR20030013795 | KR100375890B | WO03029292 | WO2004015107 | US6703204 | KR20050012082 | KR20050018140 | - LIU Z. ET AL., JBC, (1992), vol. 267, pages 15829 - 15835 | - LIU Z. ET AL., JBC, (1996), vol. 271, pages 2817 - 2822 | - BABOSHINA OV; HAAS AL., JBC, (1996), vol. 271, pages 2823 - 2831 | - MUTTER GL; BAAK JPA., J CLIN PATHOL., (2005), vol. 58, no. L, pages 1 - 6 | - WELSH JB ET AL., PNAS USA, (2001), vol. 98, pages 1176 - 1181 | - WAGNER KW, ONCOGENE, (2004), vol. 23, pages 6621 - 6629 | - KAELIN WG JR., NAT REV CANCER, (2002), vol. 2, pages 673 - 682 | - CURR OPI GEN DEV, (2003), vol. 13, pages 56 - 60 | - TRENDS MOL MED, (2004), vol. 10, pages 146 - 149 | - TRENDS MOL MED, (2004), vol. 10, pages 466 - 472 | - GENE THER, (2003), vol. 10, pages 2081 - 2089 | - NAT REV CANCER, (2002), vol. 2, pages 673 - 682 | - NAT MED, (2003), vol. 9, pages 677 - 684 | - NAT, (1992), vol. 359, pages 843 - 845 | - NAT, (1992), vol. 359, pages 845 - 848 | - PNAS USA, (1997), vol. 94, pages 8104 - 8109 | - CAN RES, (2000), vol. 60, pages 4010 - 4015 | - OPHTHALMOLOGY, (2002), vol. 109, pages 1745 - 1751 | - PROC AM SOC CLIN ONCOL, (2002), vol. 21, page 15 | - YLA-HERTTUALA S; ALITALO K, NAT MED., (2003), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 694 - 701 | - KHAN TA ET AL., GENE THER, (2003), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 285 - 291 | - LEUNG DW ET AL., SCIENCE, (19881208), vol. 246, no. 4935, pages 1306 - 1309 | - DVORAK HF ET AL., AM J PATHOL., (1995), vol. 146, no. 5, pages 1029 - 1039 | - MKINEN K ET AL., MOL. THER., (2002), vol. 6, pages 127 - 133 | - DOR Y ET AL., EMBO J., (2002), vol. 21, pages 1939 - 1947 | - MAEKIMEN K ET AL., MOL THER, (2002), vol. 6, pages 127 - 133 | - STEWART DJ ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2002), vol. 106, pages 23 - 26 | - RAJAGOPALAN S ET AL., J AM COLL CARDIL, (2003), vol. 41, page 1604 | - VINCENT KA ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2000), vol. 102, pages 2255 - 2261 | - ELBASHIR ET AL., NATURE, (20010524), vol. 411, no. 6836, pages 494 - 498 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1991), vol. 32, pages 30005 - 30008 | - NAGAI ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETT, (1985), vol. 26, page 647 | - EWENSON ET AL., J MED CHEM, (1986), vol. 29, page 295 | - GORDON ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1985), vol. 126, page 419 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Science, MACK PUBLISHING COMPANY | - MOL THER., (2004), vol. 10, pages 938 - 949 | - EMBO J, (2003), vol. 22, pages 5241 - 5250 | - PNAS USA, (2000), vol. 97, pages 8507 - 8512 | - GENES & DEVELOPMENT, (1998), vol. 12, pages 3872 - 3881 | - JBC, (2000), vol. 275, pages 14005 - 14008 | - JBC, (2000), vol. 275, pages 8945 - 8951 | - JBC, (2004), vol. 279, pages 42169 - 42181 | - JBC, (2002), vol. 277, pages 30338 - 30393 | - CURR BIOL, (1999), vol. 9, pages 1180 - 1182 | - CHEN Z ET AL., NATURE, (2005), vol. 436, pages 725 - 730 | - NAT, (1999), vol. 399, pages 271 - 299 |