EP3068125 - A method of manufacturing a multiple view camera system and multiple view camera system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O.Box 5052 Troy MI 48007 / US | [2016/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zurowski, Miroslaw J. Ul. Cmielemiec 8/44 30-348 Krakow / PL | 02 /
Duralek, Janusz Ul. Kosciuszki 42 33-380 Krynica Zdroj / PL | 03 /
Antos, Przemyslaw Sloneczna 19 32-050 Skawina / PL | [2016/37] | Representative(s) | BorgWarner France SAS Campus Saint Christophe Bâtiment Galilée 2 10, avenue de l'Entreprise 95863 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/37] | Delphi France SAS Patent Department 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 15158312.7 | 09.03.2015 | [2016/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3068125 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N13/02 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
G03B17/02 (EP);
H04N13/243 (EP,US);
G03B35/08 (EP);
H04N13/239 (EP);
H04N23/51 (EP);
H04N23/90 (EP);
H04N2213/001 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRFACHANSICHTSKAMERASYSTEMS UND MEHRFACHANSICHTSKAMERASYSTEM | [2016/37] | English: | A method of manufacturing a multiple view camera system and multiple view camera system | [2016/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SYSTÈME DE CAMÉRA À VUES MULTIPLES ET SYSTÈME DE CAMÉRA À VUES MULTIPLES | [2016/37] | Examination procedure | 15.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 02.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008181488 (ISHII YOHEI [JP], et al) [A] 7* figure 19 *; | [A]US2012086784 (OH SANGYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0058] *; | [XI]WO2013152402 (BLACKMAGIC DESIGN PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 1,6,8 * page 23, lines 3-21; figure 18 * [I] 2-5,7-15; | [A]US2014063302 (SHUKLA ASHUTOSH Y [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] *; | [A]US2015029313 (MÜLLER GERHARD [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0052] * | by applicant | WO2013155403 |