EP2918921 - HOT WATER GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moriwaki, Shunji c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd., IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Aoyama, Shigeo c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd., IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Teruo c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd., IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Shigeta, Akihiro c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd., IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | [2015/38] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2015/38] | Application number, filing date | 15158678.1 | 11.03.2015 | [2015/38] | Priority number, date | JP20140048457 | 12.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014048457 | JP20140048461 | 12.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014048461 | [2015/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2918921 | Date: | 16.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2918921 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24D3/18, F25B6/04, F24D19/00, F25B47/02, F24D19/10, F25B25/00, F25B49/02 | [2017/38] | CPC: |
F24D3/18 (EP);
F24H15/212 (EP,US);
F24D19/0095 (EP);
F24D19/1039 (EP,US);
F24H15/128 (EP,US);
F24H15/34 (EP,US);
F24H15/38 (EP,US);
F25B25/005 (EP);
F25B47/025 (EP);
F25B49/02 (EP);
F25B6/04 (EP);
F24D2200/123 (EP);
F24H15/136 (EP,US);
F24H15/219 (EP,US);
F24H15/231 (EP,US);
F24H15/258 (EP,US);
F24H15/345 (EP,US);
F24H15/385 (EP,US);
F25B2339/047 (EP);
F25B2600/0253 (EP);
F25B2700/2116 (EP);
F25B2700/21161 (EP);
F25B2700/2117 (EP);
Y02B30/12 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/38] | F24D3/18, F25B6/04, F24D19/00, F25B47/02, F24D19/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2015/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HEISSWASSERERZEUGER | [2015/38] | English: | HOT WATER GENERATOR | [2015/38] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR D'EAU CHAUDE | [2015/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 13.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2015 | AL | 28.02.2018 | AT | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | IT | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | MK | 28.02.2018 | NL | 28.02.2018 | PL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | RS | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | IE | 11.03.2018 | LU | 11.03.2018 | MT | 11.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | NO | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 11.03.2015 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 11.03.2015 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4796437 (JAMES LARRY S [US]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [A]US5269153 (CAWLEY RICHARD E [US]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP1533154 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0087]; figures 1,2, 3, 5 * [Y] 7-9; | [A]WO2006114983 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2011021882 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [Y] 7-9 * paragraph [0226] - paragraph [0229] *; | [A]EP2410249 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2420746 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP2482014 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 7-9 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039]; figure 1 * | by applicant | JP5264973B |