EP2931000 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU CONNECTED TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2019/02] |
Former [2015/42] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hata, Yoshiaki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Iimori, Eiji c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Uchino, Makoto c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/03] | Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2015/42] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 15158885.2 | 12.03.2015 | [2015/42] | Priority number, date | JP20140079760 | 08.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014079760 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2931000 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2931000 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04W76/15, // H04W88/06 | [2018/31] | CPC: |
H04L67/02 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US);
H04W76/15 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | H04W76/04, // H04W76/02, H04W88/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/14] |
Former [2015/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG, DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND DRAHTLOSES KOMMUNIKATIONSPROGRAMM | [2015/42] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION PROGRAM | [2015/42] | French: | APPAREIL, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2015/42] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/14] | 14.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2015 | AL | 16.01.2019 | AT | 16.01.2019 | CY | 16.01.2019 | CZ | 16.01.2019 | DK | 16.01.2019 | EE | 16.01.2019 | ES | 16.01.2019 | FI | 16.01.2019 | HR | 16.01.2019 | IT | 16.01.2019 | LT | 16.01.2019 | LV | 16.01.2019 | MC | 16.01.2019 | MK | 16.01.2019 | NL | 16.01.2019 | PL | 16.01.2019 | RO | 16.01.2019 | RS | 16.01.2019 | SE | 16.01.2019 | SI | 16.01.2019 | SK | 16.01.2019 | SM | 16.01.2019 | TR | 16.01.2019 | IE | 12.03.2019 | LU | 12.03.2019 | MT | 12.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | BG | 16.04.2019 | NO | 16.04.2019 | GR | 17.04.2019 | IS | 16.05.2019 | PT | 16.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.03.2015 | |
AL | 16.01.2019 | ||
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
MT | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
IE | 12.03.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
LU | 12.03.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
EE | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
ES | 16.01.2019 | ||
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
IT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
HR | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
LV | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 16.01.2019 | |
FI | 16.01.2019 | ||
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
PL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
SE | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 16.01.2019 | |
LT | 16.01.2019 | ||
NL | 16.01.2019 | ||
NO | 16.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 16.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006135206 (LOUKS RONALD A [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0046] *; | [A]US2011310787 (SHERIFF IRFAN [US], et al) [A] 1-6* paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0052] * | by applicant | JP2008136150 | JP2011166251 |