EP2924104 - Laundry unit dose article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brooker, Alan Thomas Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne, NE12 9BZ / GB | 02 /
Souter, Philip Frank Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne, NE12 9BZ / GB | 03 /
Smith, Andrew John Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne, NE12 9BZ / GB | 04 /
Baez Chavez, Jose David Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne, NE12 9BZ / GB | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | Pickford, James Lawrence Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 15159146.8 | 16.03.2015 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | EP20140161368 | 24.03.2014 Original published format: EP 14161368 | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2924104 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C11D17/04 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
C11D17/045 (EP,CN,US);
C11D17/043 (CN,US);
C11D2111/12 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2015/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wäscheeinheitsdosisartikel | [2015/40] | English: | Laundry unit dose article | [2015/40] | French: | Article de dose unitaire de lessive | [2015/40] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.09.2021 | 29.09.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0183667 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * example -; claim - *; | [I]US2003050209 (PERKIS KRISTIN NICOLE [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO03044155 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-16* page 3, lines 2-13; example -; claim - *; | [I]US2012159718 (CATLIN TANGUY MARIE LOUIS ALEXANDRE [BE], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0017]; example -; claim - *; | [I]WO2012104610 (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-16 * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 15; figure -; example -; claim - * |