EP2930884 - OBJECT-ORIENTED NETWORK VIRTUALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/42] | Object-oriented network virtualization | ||
[2016/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Xi c/o Fujitsu Laboratories of America, Inc. 1240 East Arques Ave M/S 345 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 02 /
Sekiya, Motoyoshi c/o Fujitsu Laboratories of America, Inc. 1240 East Arques Ave M/S 345 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 03 /
Palacharia, Paparao c/o Fujitsu Laboratories of America, Inc. 1240 East Arques Ave M/S 345 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 04 /
Zhang, Qiong c/o Fujitsu Laboratories of America, Inc. 1240 East Arques Ave M/S 345 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | 05 /
Kim, Inwoong c/o Fujitsu Laboratories of America, Inc. 1240 East Arques Ave M/S 345 Sunnyvale, CA 94085 / US | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/42] | Application number, filing date | 15159181.5 | 16.03.2015 | [2015/42] | Priority number, date | US201461977991P | 10.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461977991 P | US201414575951 | 18.12.2014 Original published format: US201414575951 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2930884 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2930884 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2015/42] | CPC: |
H04L41/0806 (EP,US);
H04L41/0233 (EP,US);
H04L41/04 (US);
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/14] |
Former [2015/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OBJEKTORIENTIERTE NETZWERKVIRTUALISIERUNG | [2015/42] | English: | OBJECT-ORIENTED NETWORK VIRTUALIZATION | [2016/33] | French: | VIRTUALISATION DE RÉSEAU ORIENTÉ OBJET | [2015/42] |
Former [2015/42] | Object-oriented network virtualization | Examination procedure | 29.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/14] | 13.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2015 | AL | 21.12.2016 | AT | 21.12.2016 | BE | 21.12.2016 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | ES | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | IT | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | MK | 21.12.2016 | NL | 21.12.2016 | PL | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | RS | 21.12.2016 | SE | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | SM | 21.12.2016 | TR | 21.12.2016 | IE | 16.03.2017 | LU | 16.03.2017 | MT | 16.03.2017 | BG | 21.03.2017 | NO | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 16.03.2015 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
TR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.03.2017 | ||
MT | 16.03.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 16.03.2015 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.03.2017 | ||
MT | 16.03.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 16.03.2015 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.03.2017 | ||
MT | 16.03.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.03.2015 | |
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.03.2017 | ||
MT | 16.03.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.03.2017 | ||
MT | 16.03.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 16.03.2017 | ||
LU | 16.03.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 16.03.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 21.12.2016 | |
BE | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 21.12.2016 | |
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
RS | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO03090087 (EMC CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-7,9-14,16-20 * abstract * * page 2, line 6 - page 6, line 14 * * page 7, line 27 - page 18, line 15; figures 1-4 * * page 20, line 10 - page 27, line 30; figures 6-9 * [A] 2,8,15; | [XA]US2013283265 (ACHARYA ARUP [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-14,16-20 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0039]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0053]; figures 3-6 * [A] 2,8,15; | [A]US2014059226 (MESSERLI ANTONY JOEL [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0106]; figures 4-6 ** paragraph [0122] - paragraph [0198]; figures 4-10 * |