EP2924475 - Insolation information generating device, insolation information providing system and insolation information providing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2015/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shin, Hiromasa c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Maruchi, Kohei c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Endoh, Yusuke c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Hasegawa, Yoshiaki c/o IP Div. Toshiba Corp. (K. K. TOSHIBA) 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | [2015/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/40] | Application number, filing date | 15159184.9 | 16.03.2015 | [2015/40] | Priority number, date | JP20140055912 | 19.03.2014 Original published format: JP 2014055912 | [2015/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2924475 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01W1/12, G06Q10/04, G01C21/34 | [2015/40] | CPC: |
G01C21/3469 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (US);
G01C21/3453 (EP,US);
G01W1/12 (EP,US);
G06F17/10 (US);
G06Q10/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SONNENEINSTRAHLUNGSINFORMATIONSERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, SONNENEINSTRAHLUNGSINFORMATIONSBEREITSTELLUNGSSYSTEM UND SONNENEINSTRAHLUNGSINFORMATIONSBEREITSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2015/40] | English: | Insolation information generating device, insolation information providing system and insolation information providing method | [2015/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION D'INFORMATIONS D'INSOLATION, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'INFORMATIONS D'INSOLATION | [2015/40] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/40] | 31.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/39] | 11.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2008105045 (WORO AARON WILLIAM [US]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0079] - [0091] *; | [A]US2009125275 (WORO AARON WILLIAM [US]) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0136] - [0143] *; | [A]DE102010042411 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0028] - [0033] * |