EP2977055 - FACTOR VIII FUSION PROTEIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2017 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | 28.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2016/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nørby, Peder Lisby Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
Bolt, Gert Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 03 /
Kjærgaard, Kristian Novo Nordisk A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [2016/04] | Application number, filing date | 15159991.7 | 10.02.2011 | [2016/04] | Priority number, date | EP20100153715 | 16.02.2010 Original published format: EP 10153715 | US20100306177P | 19.02.2010 Original published format: US 306177 P | [2016/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2977055 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/37, C07K14/745, C07K14/755 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
C07K14/755 (EP,US);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C07K14/70535 (US);
C07K14/76 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2016/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FAKTOR-VIII-FUSIONSPROTEINE | [2016/04] | English: | FACTOR VIII FUSION PROTEIN | [2016/04] | French: | PROTÉINES DE FUSION DE FACTEUR VIII | [2016/04] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 16.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/04] | 28.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 15.12.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11703448.8 / EP2536754 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.06.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.07.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005260194 (PETERS ROBERT T [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * example 1; claims 1,4-6 *; | [I]WO2008077616 (CSL BEHRING GMBH [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * example 2; claim 1 *; | [I]WO2009108806 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [I] 1-15 * claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0319315 | US5932462 | US5629384 | WO03031464 | WO2006102652 | WO2007056191 |