EP2911158 - METHOD OF SORTING MATERIALS USING HOLOGRAPHIC LASER STEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/35] | System and method of sorting materials using holographic laser steering | ||
[2017/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Premium Genetics (UK) Limited Alpha Building London Road Stapeley, Nantwich, Cheshire CW5 7JW / GB | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gruber, Lewis Premium Genetics (UK) Limited 400 E. Randolph Apt. 3911 Chicago, IL 60601 / US | 02 /
Bradley, Kenneth Premium Genetics (UK) Limited 424 N. Garfield Avenue Hinsdale, IL 60521 / US | 03 /
Lopes, Ward Premium Genetics (UK) Limited 2022 W 19th St. No. 2 Chicago, IL 60614 / US | 04 /
Lancelot, Robert W. Premium Genetics (UK) Limited 22116 Old Farm Road Barrington, IL 60010 / US | 05 /
Plewa, Joseph S. Premium Genetics (UK) Limited 1017 N. Delphia Avenue Park Ridge, IL 60068 / US | 06 /
Grier, David Premium Genetics (UK) Limited 120 W 15th St No. 2G New York, NY 10011 / US | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Tranter, Andrew David Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15160613.4 | 31.07.2003 | [2015/35] | Priority number, date | US20020399386P | 31.07.2002 Original published format: US 399386 P | US20020435541P | 20.12.2002 Original published format: US 435541 P | [2015/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2911158 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2911158 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/32, G03H1/08, H05H3/04, G01N15/14, B01L3/00, G03H1/00, G03H1/22 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
G01N15/1459 (EP,US);
G02B21/32 (EP,US);
H05H3/04 (EP,US);
B01L3/5027 (EP,US);
G01N15/149 (EP,US);
G03H1/08 (EP,US);
G03H1/2294 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0077 (EP,US);
G03H2001/085 (EP,US);
G03H2225/32 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/35] | G21K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/14] |
Former [2015/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SORTIEREN VON MATERIALIEN MIT HOLOGRAFISCHER LASERSTEUERUNG | [2017/28] | English: | METHOD OF SORTING MATERIALS USING HOLOGRAPHIC LASER STEERING | [2017/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRIER DES MATÉRIAUX À L'AIDE DE DIRECTION HOLOGRAPHIQUE AU LASER | [2017/28] |
Former [2015/35] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM SORTIEREN VON MATERIALIEN MIT HOLOGRAFISCHER LASERSTEUERUNG | ||
Former [2015/35] | System and method of sorting materials using holographic laser steering | ||
Former [2015/35] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR TRIER DES MATÉRIAUX À L'AIDE DE DIRECTION HOLOGRAPHIQUE AU LASER | Examination procedure | 26.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/14] | 11.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03772098.4 / EP1573641 | EP10182979.4 / EP2270817 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2003 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IE | 31.07.2018 | LU | 31.07.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 31.07.2003 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.07.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.07.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.07.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.07.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 06.12.2017 | |
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 06.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4395397 (SHAPIRO HOWARD M) [Y] 1-7,10-23,26,27 * column 1, lines 5-7 * * column 3, lines 2-5 * * fig. 1 and the description thereof *; | [Y]WO9810267 (UNIV DENMARK TECH DTU [DK], et al) [Y] 1-7,10-23,26,27 * page 18, lines 30-33 ** see fig 1 and the description thereof * | by applicant | US5939716 | US6055106 | - J. ARLT; M. J. PADGETT, "Generation of a beam with a dark focus surrounded by regions of higher intensity: The optical bottle beam", OPT. LETT., (2000), vol. 25, pages 191 - 193, XP000947113 | - J. L. SCHENK ET AL., PROCEEDINGS, THE RANGE BEEF COW SYMPOSIUM, (1999), vol. XVI | - ERIK B. VAN MUNSTER, CYTOMETRY, (2002), vol. 47, page 192 |