EP3072487 - ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH IMPROVED CONTAINMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2018 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 16.03.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2016/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martynus, Cornelia Beate Procter & Gamble Sulzbacher Strasse 40 65824 Schwalbach / DE | 02 /
Roe, Donald Carroll The Procter & Gamble Company One P&G Plaza Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45202 / US | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Borbach, Markus Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Borbach, Markus Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 15160838.7 | 25.03.2015 | [2016/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3072487 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/494, A61F13/495 | [2016/39] | CPC: |
A61F13/495 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/4942 (EP,CN,US);
A61F13/49017 (CN,US);
A61F2013/4951 (CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] |
Former [2016/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSORBIERENDER ARTIKEL MIT VERBESSERTER EINDÄMMUNG | [2016/39] | English: | ABSORBENT ARTICLE WITH IMPROVED CONTAINMENT | [2016/39] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT AVEC CONFINEMENT AMÉLIORÉ | [2016/39] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 23.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/16] | 15.03.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2018 | 20.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2007203096 (JAPAN ABSORBENT TECH INST) [X] 1 * abstract * [I] 2-15; | [XI]EP1982679 (JAPAN ABSORBENT TECH INST [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0009] - [0010]; figure 32b * [I] 2-15; | [XI]US2015065973 (ROE DONALD CARROLL [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 27,28,30 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]EP2762116 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1 * figures 2-3 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]GB2287888 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]) [X] 1 * figures 6-10 * [I] 2-15; | [XI]JP2013144153 (DAIO SEISHI KK) [X] 1 * figure 4c * [I] 2-15 | by applicant | US2011015606 | US3637427 | US2004067710 | US3860003 | US4808178 | US4909803 | US4695278 | US4795454 | US3848594 | US4662875 | US4846815 | US4894060 | US4946527 | US5151092 | US5221274 | US6432098 | US4963140 | US4699622 | US5242436 | US5499978 | US5507736 | US5591152 | US4515595 | US4710189 |