EP2937526 - COMBINED HEAT AND POWER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hikichi, Takumi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Kido, Osao c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Okaichi, Atsuo c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Nishiyama, Noriyoshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
Tomigashi, Yoshio c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
Konoto, Masaaki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
Kosuda, Osamu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 08 /
Matsumoto, Subaru c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 09 /
Matsuyama, Tetsuya c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61 Shiromi, Chuo-ku Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2015/44] | Application number, filing date | 15161403.9 | 27.03.2015 | [2015/44] | Priority number, date | JP20140077533 | 04.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014077533 | [2015/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937526 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2937526 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01K13/02, F01K25/08 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
F01K13/02 (EP,US);
F01K17/02 (US);
F01K25/08 (EP,US);
F01K7/16 (US);
F01C1/0207 (US);
Y02E20/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] |
Former [2015/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMBINIERTES WÄRME- UND STROMERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM | [2015/44] | English: | COMBINED HEAT AND POWER SYSTEM | [2015/44] | French: | SYSTÈME COMBINÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ELECRICITE ET DE CHAUFFAGE | [2015/44] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 11.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2015 | AL | 22.03.2017 | AT | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | HR | 22.03.2017 | IT | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | MK | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | RS | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | SM | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | IE | 27.03.2017 | LU | 27.03.2017 | MT | 27.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | FR | 22.05.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | NO | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.03.2015 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 27.03.2015 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 27.03.2015 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.03.2015 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1316679 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2009071156 (NISHIKAWA MICHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* paragraph [0151] *; | [A]EP2204902 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048] *; | [A]DE102010024186 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1,2; claims 1-3 * | Examination | EP2918794 | by applicant | JPH10266980 | EP2014880 |