EP3075340 - TISSUE SHEARS FOR BIOLOGICAL TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erbe Elektromedizin GmbH Waldhörnlestrasse 17 72072 Tübingen / DE | [2017/04] |
Former [2016/40] | For all designated states ERBE Elektromedizin GmbH Waldhörnlestraße 17 72072 Tübingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiller, Jürgen Lönsweg 4 72581 Dettingen / DE | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/31] | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen a. N. / DE | ||
Former [2016/40] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 15161680.2 | 30.03.2015 | [2016/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3075340 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3075340 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
A61B18/1445 (EP,BR,RU,US);
A61B18/12 (CN);
A61B18/1447 (BR,RU,US);
A61B2018/00077 (BR,US);
A61B2018/00083 (EP,BR,US);
A61B2018/00095 (EP,BR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Title | German: | Gewebeschere für biologisches Gewebe | [2016/40] | English: | TISSUE SHEARS FOR BIOLOGICAL TISSUE | [2016/40] | French: | CISEAUX CHIRURGICAUX POUR TISSUS BIOLOGIQUES | [2016/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2015 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 03.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 22.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/10] | HR | 02.08.2023 | |
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 02.11.2023 | |
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0517244 (HEMOSTATIC SURGERY CORP [KY]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * column 7, line 10 - column 10, line 34; figures 1, 2, 4 und 7 * [Y] 8; | [X]US5484436 (EGGERS PHILIP E [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-15 * column 2, line 51 - column 4, line 12; figure 1 und 4 * * column 5, line 61 - column 6, line 49 * * column 7, lines 18-56 *; | [A]US6447511 (SLATER CHARLES R [US]) [A] 1-15* column 6, line 34 - column 8, line 54; figures 5-11 *; | [Y]EP2554132 (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE]) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0030]; figures 1-7 * | Examination | US6106542 | US6312430 | by applicant | DE4212063 | US5925039 | US5925043 | US2013338663 |