EP3075404 - INFORMATION PROVIDER ASSEMBLY TO BE USED WITH A MEDICAMENT DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carebay Europe Ltd. 57 Tigne Palace, Suite 3 Bisazza Street Sliema, SLM 1643 / MT | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hautaviita, Nikolaj Rättarbodavägen 19 19791 Bro / SE | 02 /
Renstad, Rasmus Birger Jarlsgatan 38 114 29 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
Säll, Daniel Jägmästarvägen 1 SE14173 Segeltorp / SE | [2016/40] | Application number, filing date | 15161685.1 | 30.03.2015 | [2016/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3075404 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, G06F19/00 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
A61M5/31525 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61M5/31528 (KR);
A61M5/31545 (KR);
G16H20/17 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2005/3125 (KR);
A61M2205/3576 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSANBIETERANORDNUNG ZUM GEBRAUCH MIT EINER MEDIKAMENTENVERABREICHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/40] | English: | INFORMATION PROVIDER ASSEMBLY TO BE USED WITH A MEDICAMENT DELIVERY DEVICE | [2016/40] | French: | ENSEMBLE FOURNISSEUR D'INFORMATIONS POUR UN DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS | [2016/40] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2015 | Examination requested [2016/40] | 10.03.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2013050535 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [AD] 1-15 * page 24, line 27 - line 36 * * figures 1, 2A-2C *; | [A]US2003233069 (GILLESPIE JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0089]; figures 15, 16 * | by applicant | US5536249 | WO2013050535 |