EP2930271 - TRAFFIC CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ERECTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.12.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmont Nederland B.V. Den Engelsman 3 6026 RB Maarheeze / NL | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Dijk, Jacobus Leonardus Adrianus 't Hagelkruis 4 6026 BC Maarheeze / NL | 02 /
Stomphorst, Geert Kuiperstraat 6 5991 MB Baarlo / NL | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2015/42] | Jilderda, Anne Ayolt Octrooibureau LIOC B.V. Postbus 13363 3507 LJ Utrecht / NL | Application number, filing date | 15162809.6 | 08.04.2015 | [2015/42] | Priority number, date | NL20142012595 | 09.04.2014 Original published format: NL 2012595 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2930271 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E01F9/696 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
E01F9/696 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | E01F9/011 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] |
Former [2015/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERKEHRSKONTROLLEINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEREN AUFBAU | [2015/42] | English: | TRAFFIC CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ERECTION THEREOF | [2015/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE DE TRAFIC ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'ÉRECTION | [2015/42] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 14.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 16.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/04] | 04.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 29.07.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.08.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 29.07.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.08.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2473859 (CROWN UK LTD [GB]) [X] 1,10-12 * the whole document * [Y] 2-9; | [Y]DE202013105742U (LUTHER HORST [DE]) [Y] 2-9 * the whole document *; | [A]CN2429555Y (SHENHUA TRAFFIC ENGINEERING CO [CN]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-13 *; | [A]FR2913029 (SIGNATURE CIE SOC PAR ACTIONS [FR]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, lines 28-32 * * page 3, lines 24-29; figures 1-7 * |