EP3078637 - DEVICE FOR FORMING A HEAD PART OF A LIQUID TREATMENT APPARATUS AND LIQUID TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brita GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 4 65232 Taunusstein / DE | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zöller, Jochen Wilhelm Nesen Strasse 61 56355 Nastätten / DE | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Bankgasse 3 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/41] | Application number, filing date | 15162967.2 | 09.04.2015 | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3078637 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/00, B01D35/157 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
C02F1/283 (EP,CN,US);
B01D35/306 (KR);
B01D29/96 (CN);
G05D7/0635 (US);
B01D35/00 (CN);
B01D61/12 (US);
B01D61/22 (US);
C02F1/001 (KR);
C02F1/281 (CN);
C02F1/42 (EP,CN,US);
C02F1/441 (EP,CN,US);
C02F1/444 (CN);
F16K3/04 (US);
B01D2201/303 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2313/18 (US);
B01D61/025 (US);
B01D61/027 (US);
B01D61/147 (US);
C02F2001/425 (EP,CN,US);
C02F2201/005 (EP,US);
C02F2201/006 (EP,US);
C02F2301/043 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KOPFTEILS EINER FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/41] | English: | DEVICE FOR FORMING A HEAD PART OF A LIQUID TREATMENT APPARATUS AND LIQUID TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2016/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FORMER UNE PARTIE DE TÊTE D'UN APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE LIQUIDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE LIQUIDE | [2016/41] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 19.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1106578 (BRITA GMBH [DE]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0026]; figure 3 *; | [A]US2005167352 (BURROWS BRUCE D [US], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0037] - [0038]; figure 5 *; | [A]GB2465622 (FAIREY CERAMICS [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2012325732 (SCHOLZ ROLAND [DE], et al) [I] 1-3,7-15 * figures 1-2, 12-14, 16, 18-21 *; | [A]US2014374336 (SHERMAN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0011] * | by applicant | EP0890774 | US2007215531 | WO2015EP50155 |