EP2958049 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EXTRACTING FEATURE REGIONS FROM POINT CLOUD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hwang, Hyoseok c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 97, Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Nam, Dong Kyung c/o Samsung Advanced Insitute of Technology 97, Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si 446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | Portch, Daniel Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15163246.0 | 10.04.2015 | [2015/52] | Priority number, date | KR20140075527 | 20.06.2014 Original published format: KR 20140075527 | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2958049 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2958049 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/52, G06T17/00 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
G06T17/005 (EP,US);
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06V10/462 (EP,US);
G06V10/52 (EP,US);
G06V20/64 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] |
Former [2015/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EXTRAKTION VON MERKMALSREGIONEN AUS PUNKTWOLKEN | [2015/52] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EXTRACTING FEATURE REGIONS FROM POINT CLOUD | [2015/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT L'EXTRACTION DE RÉGIONS CARACTÉRISTIQUES À PARTIR D'UN NUAGE DE POINTS | [2015/52] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 04.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/41] | 23.05.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - FLINT A ET AL, "Local 3D structure recognition in range images", IET COMPUTER VISION,, (20081211), vol. 2, no. 4, doi:10.1049/IET-CVI:20080037, ISSN 1751-9640, pages 208 - 217, XP006032109 [X] 1-5,9-13,15 * sect.1, 2.1-2.3 * [I] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/IET-CVI:20080037 | [XI] - JAN KNOPP ET AL, Hough Transform and 3D SURF for Robust Three Dimensional Classification, COMPUTER VISION - ECCV 2010 : 11TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, HÇRAKLEION, CRETE, GREECE, SEPTEMBER 5-11, 2010; PROCEEDINGS, BERLIN [U.A.] : SPRINGER, DE, PAGE(S) 589 - 602, (20100905), ISBN 978-3-642-15566-6, XP019150824 [X] 1-5,9-13,15 * sect.1, 2, 4.4 * [I] 6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-15567-3_43 | [X] - JEAN-FRANÇOIS LALONDE ET AL, "Natural terrain classification using three-dimensional ladar data for ground robot mobility", JOURNAL OF FIELD ROBOTICS, US, (20060607), vol. 23, no. 10, doi:10.1002/rob.20134, ISSN 1556-4959, pages 839 - 861, XP055253221 [X] 1-5 * sect.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/rob.20134 | [A] - Dimitri Lisin, "IMAGE CLASSIFICATION WITH BAGS OF LOCAL FEATURES", PhD, Univ. of Massachusetts Amherst, (20060501), URL: http://vis-www.cs.umass.edu/papers/dima_lisin_thesis.pdf, (20160225), XP055253284 [A] 1-15 * Table of contents, sect.2.3 * | [T] - Ben Gorte ET AL, "3D Image Processing to Reconstruct Trees from Laser Scans", Proceedings of the 10th annual conference of the Advanced School for Computing and Imaging., (20040601), URL: http://www.lr.tudelft.nl/fileadmin/Faculteit/LR/Organisatie/Afdelingen_en_Leerstoelen/Afdeling_RS/Optical_and_Laser_Remote_Sensing/Publications/Papers/015-2004/doc/asci04gorte.pdf, (20160226), XP055253380 [T] 7,8 * sect.3.1 and 3.2 * | [T] - Anonymous, "Point Cloud Library (PCL): Module filters", (20140717), URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20140717174008/http://docs.pointclouds.org/trunk/group__filters.html#gab8ec453347225d3a0d34c70e0a9ee223, (20160226), XP055253373 [T] 7,8 * the whole document * |