EP2930524 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, DIAGNOSTIC TEST, AND DIAGNOSTIC TEST CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renesas Electronics Corporation 2-24, Toyosu 3-chome Koutou-ku Tokyo 135-0061 / JP | [2015/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuboi, Yukitoshi c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 02 /
Nagano, Hideo c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 03 /
Nagaoka, Hiroshi c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 04 /
Matsunaga, Yusuke c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 05 /
Igaku, Yutaka c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | 06 /
Kubota, Naotaka c/o Renesas Electronics Corporation 1753, Shimonumabe, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8668 / JP | [2015/42] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2017/34] |
Former [2015/42] | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Theatinerstraße 8 (Fünf Höfe) 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15163316.1 | 13.04.2015 | [2015/42] | Priority number, date | JP20140081852 | 11.04.2014 Original published format: JP 2014081852 | JP20150016443 | 30.01.2015 Original published format: JP 2015016443 | [2015/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2930524 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2930524 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/3185, G01R31/3177, G06F11/08 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
G01R31/318544 (EP,US);
G01R31/3177 (US);
G06F11/08 (US)
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | G01R31/3185 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2015/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT, DIAGNOSETEST UND DIAGNOSETESTSCHALTUNG | [2015/42] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, DIAGNOSTIC TEST, AND DIAGNOSTIC TEST CIRCUIT | [2015/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR, TEST DE DIAGNOSTIC ET CIRCUIT DE TEST DE DIAGNOSTIC | [2015/42] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17181116.9 / EP3264117 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2015 | AL | 23.08.2017 | AT | 23.08.2017 | CY | 23.08.2017 | CZ | 23.08.2017 | DK | 23.08.2017 | EE | 23.08.2017 | ES | 23.08.2017 | FI | 23.08.2017 | HR | 23.08.2017 | IT | 23.08.2017 | LT | 23.08.2017 | LV | 23.08.2017 | MC | 23.08.2017 | MK | 23.08.2017 | NL | 23.08.2017 | PL | 23.08.2017 | PT | 23.08.2017 | RO | 23.08.2017 | RS | 23.08.2017 | SE | 23.08.2017 | SI | 23.08.2017 | SK | 23.08.2017 | SM | 23.08.2017 | TR | 23.08.2017 | BG | 23.11.2017 | NO | 23.11.2017 | GR | 24.11.2017 | IS | 23.12.2017 | IE | 13.04.2018 | LU | 13.04.2018 | MT | 13.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | FR | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.04.2015 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CY | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
MK | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.04.2018 | ||
MT | 13.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 13.04.2015 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.04.2018 | ||
MT | 13.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.04.2018 | ||
MT | 13.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.04.2018 | ||
MT | 13.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.04.2018 | ||
MT | 13.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
FR | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
IE | 13.04.2018 | ||
LU | 13.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
LU | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
IT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
SM | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
ES | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
HR | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RS | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
NO | 23.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 23.08.2017 | |
NO | 23.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6191603 (MURADALI FIDEL [US], et al) [X] 1,19,20 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 23 * * column 2, line 47 - column 7, line 67 * [I] 2-18; | [XI]US2004006729 (PENDURKAR RAJESH Y [US]) [X] 1,19,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0047] *[I] 2-18; | [XI]US2004054950 (LARSON LEE A [US], et al) [X] 1,19,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * [I] 2-18 | by applicant | JPH1011319 | JP2012194111 |