EP2933437 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ANTI-ROTATION FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Willett, Matthew R. 96 Miller Ave, Apt 11 Portsmouth, New Hampshire 03801 / US | 02 /
Warner, Charles H. 35 Carter Street South Portland, Maine 04106 / US | 03 /
Cassella, Gerald D. P.O. Box 576 North Berwick, Maine 03906 / US | 04 /
Earl, Jonathan J. 342 Perry Oliver Road Wells, Maine 04090 / US | 05 /
Lyons, Christopher B. 81 Selden Drive West Hartford, Connecticut 06111 / US | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2019/30] |
Former [2015/43] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15163772.5 | 15.04.2015 | [2015/43] | Priority number, date | US201461980169P | 16.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461980169 P | [2015/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933437 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2933437 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D25/24 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F01D9/041 (EP,US);
F05D2220/32 (US);
F05D2230/10 (US);
F05D2230/30 (US);
F05D2230/60 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2015/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR VERDREHSICHERUNGSFUNKTIONEN | [2015/43] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ANTI-ROTATION FEATURES | [2015/43] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES ANTI-ROTATION | [2015/43] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 04.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2015 | AL | 24.07.2019 | AT | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | CZ | 24.07.2019 | DK | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | ES | 24.07.2019 | FI | 24.07.2019 | HR | 24.07.2019 | IT | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MK | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | NL | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RO | 24.07.2019 | RS | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | SM | 24.07.2019 | TR | 24.07.2019 | BG | 24.10.2019 | NO | 24.10.2019 | GR | 25.10.2019 | IS | 24.11.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | IE | 15.04.2020 | LU | 15.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 15.04.2015 | |
AL | 24.07.2019 | ||
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
MT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IE | 15.04.2020 | ||
LU | 15.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IE | 15.04.2020 | ||
LU | 15.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
LU | 15.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
IT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RO | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
DK | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
TR | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
AT | 24.07.2019 | ||
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.11.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
ES | 24.07.2019 | ||
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
GR | 25.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 24.07.2019 | |
FI | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
BG | 24.10.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | |
NL | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 24.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1308630 (SNECMA MOTEURS [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]DE102009003638 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 10-15 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1-4; claims 1,6, 11-15 * [I] 1-9; | [A]US2011243725 (JONES DANIEL VERNER [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |