EP2933076 - SELF-POSITIONING KNIFE TO MAKE JOINING PROFILES IN WOOD AND TOOL PROVIDED WITH ONE OR MORE KNIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STARK SpA Strada Triestina, 8 33050 Trivignano Udinese UD / IT | [2015/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solari, Remo Via Cicogna, 32/A 33100 Udine / IT | [2015/43] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2015/43] | Application number, filing date | 15164006.7 | 17.04.2015 | [2015/43] | Priority number, date | IT2014UD00071 | 18.04.2014 Original published format: IT UD20140071 | [2015/43] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2933076 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2933076 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B27F1/16, B27G13/10, B27G13/14 | [2015/43] | CPC: |
B27F1/16 (EP);
B27G13/10 (EP);
B27G13/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] |
Former [2015/43] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SELBSTPOSITIONIERENDES MESSER ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON VERBINDUNGSPROFILEN IN HOLZ UND WERKZEUG MIT EINEM ODER MEHREREN MESSERN | [2015/43] | English: | SELF-POSITIONING KNIFE TO MAKE JOINING PROFILES IN WOOD AND TOOL PROVIDED WITH ONE OR MORE KNIVES | [2015/43] | French: | COUTEAU À AUTO-POSITIONNEMENT POUR ASSEMBLER DES PROFILÉS EN BOIS ET OUTIL MUNI D'UN OU DE PLUSIEURS COUTEAUX | [2015/43] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 30.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2015 | AL | 08.02.2017 | AT | 08.02.2017 | CY | 08.02.2017 | CZ | 08.02.2017 | DK | 08.02.2017 | EE | 08.02.2017 | ES | 08.02.2017 | FI | 08.02.2017 | HR | 08.02.2017 | IT | 08.02.2017 | LT | 08.02.2017 | LV | 08.02.2017 | MK | 08.02.2017 | NL | 08.02.2017 | RO | 08.02.2017 | RS | 08.02.2017 | SE | 08.02.2017 | SI | 08.02.2017 | SK | 08.02.2017 | SM | 08.02.2017 | TR | 08.02.2017 | MT | 17.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | BG | 08.05.2017 | NO | 08.05.2017 | GR | 09.05.2017 | IS | 08.06.2017 | PT | 08.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 17.04.2015 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
TR | 08.02.2017 | ||
MT | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 17.04.2015 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
MK | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
MT | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 17.04.2015 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CY | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
MT | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 17.04.2015 | |
AT | 08.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
MT | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
MT | 17.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SI | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
SM | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
DK | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
EE | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
IT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RO | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
SK | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
CZ | 08.02.2017 | ||
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.02.2017 | |
ES | 08.02.2017 | ||
FI | 08.02.2017 | ||
HR | 08.02.2017 | ||
LT | 08.02.2017 | ||
LV | 08.02.2017 | ||
NL | 08.02.2017 | ||
RS | 08.02.2017 | ||
SE | 08.02.2017 | ||
BG | 08.05.2017 | ||
NO | 08.05.2017 | ||
GR | 09.05.2017 | ||
PT | 08.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB742603 (FREDERICK SHILTON) [AD] 1,8,9,13 * page 2, line 22 - line 29 * * page 2, line 109 - line 114 * * page 1, line 86 - page 2, line 3 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2087792 (WADKIN LTD) [A] 1,13 * page 2, line 30 - line 38; figure - *; | [A]US2002102138 (IINUMA TOMOYUKI [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,11,12 *; | [A]EP1529612 (GARNIGA ENTPR S A S DI TODISCO [IT]) [A] 1,13 * figure - *; | [A]DE29922020U (SPERL JOSEF [AT]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE6933019U (LEITZ FA GEB [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]DE2749521 (MEC FRATELLI GARNIGA S N C OFF) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]CH436678 (BRUHIN JOSEF [CH]) [A] 13 * figure - * | by applicant | GB742603 |